This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2021 at 07:48:09 (UTC).

Alvarado et al v. Revlon Consumer Products Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 Alvarado filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Revlon Consumer Products Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01850

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Alvaro Alvarado

Maria Del Rosario Tobias

Revlon Consumer Products Company

Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc

Adventis Inc

Barretts Minerals Inc

Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC

Beyer Healthcare LLC

Brenntag Specialties LLC

Brenntag North America Inc

Clinique Laboratories Inc

Clinique Laboratories LLC

Color Techniques Inc

Cosmetic Specialties Inc

Crown Laboratories Inc

Dr Scholls LLC

Estee Lauder Inc

The Estee Lauder Companies Inc

Fisons Corporation

GSK Consumer Health

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Revlon Consumer Products Company

Whittaker Clark & Daniels Inc

Adventis Inc

Barretts Minerals Inc

Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC

Beyer Healthcare LLC

Brenntag Specialties LLC

Brenntag North America Inc

Clinique Laboratories Inc

Clinique Laboratories LLC

Color Techniques Inc

Cosmetic Specialties Inc

Crown Laboratories Inc

Dr Scholls LLC

Estee Lauder Inc

The Estee Lauder Companies Inc

Fisons Corporation

GSK Consumer Health

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Ivett Montemayor

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier

1201 Elm Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Kimberly Erin Solomon

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

2705 Bee Caves Road, Suite 220

Austin, TX 78746

Todd D Ogden

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC

2001 Bryan St, Suite 3050

Dallas, TX 75201-3008

Jeffrey Stewart Davis

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1201 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75270

Saira Siddiqui

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Mary Elizondo Frazier

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Austin C Daniel

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Edward M Slaughter

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4100 West

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason James Irvin

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly Erin Solomon

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

2705 Bee Caves Road, Suite 220

Austin, TX 78746

Todd D Ogden

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC

2001 Bryan St, Suite 3050

Dallas, TX 75201-3008

Jeffrey Stewart Davis

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1201 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75270

Saira Siddiqui

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Mary Elizondo Frazier

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Austin C Daniel

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Edward M Slaughter

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 4100 West

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason James Irvin

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

James L Ware

Attorney at Sheehy Ware & Pappas PC

2500 Two Houston Center, 909 Fannin St

Houston, TX 77010-1003

Jillian van Rensburg Keith

Attorney at Wilson Elser Mosowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4800

Dallas, TX 75202

Other Attorneys

Matthew R Miller

Attorney at Stinson LLP

3102 Oaklawn Avenue, Suite 777

Dallas, TX 75219

Gary D Elliston

Attorney at DeHay & Elliston LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3500

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brenntag Specialties LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ogden, Todd) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

44 #2

Exhibit(s) B

44 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#44

(#44) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by GSK Consumer Health with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party GSK Consumer Health(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

43 #2

Exhibit(s) B

43 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#43

(#43) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by Crown Laboratories Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party Crown Laboratories Inc(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#42

(#42) RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order

1 #9

Proposed Order

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit(s)

1 #5

Exhibit(s)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12119575) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement, #9 Proposed Order) (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brenntag Specialties LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ogden, Todd) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by GSK Consumer Health with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party GSK Consumer Health(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) and Brief in Support filed by Crown Laboratories Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)Attorney Jillian van Rensburg Keith added to party Crown Laboratories Inc(pty:dft) (Keith, Jillian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PTI Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clinique Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Estee Lauder Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) First MOTION to Withdraw Pleading filed by Clinique Laboratories LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) First AMENDED ANSWER to First AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Clinique Laboratories LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Ware, James) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barretts Minerals Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Specialty Minerals Inc for Barretts Minerals Inc. (Frazier, Mary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Pfizer Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary Elizondo Frazier added to party Pfizer Inc(pty:dft) (Frazier, Mary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Specialty Minerals Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary Elizondo Frazier added to party Specialty Minerals Inc(pty:dft) (Frazier, Mary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Barretts Minerals Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mary Elizondo Frazier added to party Barretts Minerals Inc(pty:dft) (Frazier, Mary) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cosmetic Specialties Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)Attorney Jason James Irvin added to party Cosmetic Specialties Inc(pty:dft) (Irvin, Jason) Modified title on 8/17/2021 (ygl). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: No later than 21 days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. The Court has not specifically evaluated whether the notice of removal complies with N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 81.1. If Defendant is satisfied that the notice of removal complies with Rule 81.1 and that additional documents are unnecessary to address the defect identified in this Order, the amended notice of removal required by this Order need not also contain the documents required by Rule 81.1. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/11/2021) (twd) (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/11/2021) (twd) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Revlon Consumer Products Company. (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Revlon Consumer Products Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12119575) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement, #9 Proposed Order) (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adventis Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Laboratories Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Color Techniques Inc is a litigant