This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 13:30:43 (UTC).

Altwegg v. Berman & Rabin, P.A.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Altwegg filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Berman Rabin, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam A. Crow and Gwynne E. Birzer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02242

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mathew J. Altwegg

Defendant

Berman & Rabin, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan J. Stecklein

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Matthew S. Robertson

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Michael H. Rapp

Attorney at Stecklein & Rapp Chartered

748 Ann Avenue, Suite 101

Kansas City, KS 66101

Defendant Attorney

Rachel B. Ommerman

Attorney at Berman & Rabin, PA

15280 Metcalf Avenue

Overland Park, KS 66223

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Documents by Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of documents identified in Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure by Mathew J. Altwegg re #11 Scheduling Order (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice due 9/9/2020. Mediation deadline 10/7/2020. Discovery deadline 2/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 using ACCESS CODE 9686294. Dispositive motion deadline 3/15/2021. Trial date to be determined; estimated trial time 3 days. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/7/20. (adc) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/30/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure by Mathew J. Altwegg. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 6/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/13/2020. (ala) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Mathew J. Altwegg. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Berman & Rabin, P.A..(Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Berman & Rabin, P.A. identifying none as corporate parent . (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas Limited Actions, case number 2020-LM-001717 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5140117.), filed by Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Documents by Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of documents identified in Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure by Mathew J. Altwegg re #11 Scheduling Order (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice due 9/9/2020. Mediation deadline 10/7/2020. Discovery deadline 2/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 using ACCESS CODE 9686294. Dispositive motion deadline 3/15/2021. Trial date to be determined; estimated trial time 3 days. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/7/20. (adc) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/30/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure by Mathew J. Altwegg. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 6/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/13/2020. (ala) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Mathew J. Altwegg. (Stecklein, Alan) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Berman & Rabin, P.A..(Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Berman & Rabin, P.A. identifying none as corporate parent . (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas Limited Actions, case number 2020-LM-001717 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5140117.), filed by Berman & Rabin, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ommerman, Rachel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less