This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 17:36:22 (UTC).

Altman v. BCD Travel USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2020 Altman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BCD Travel USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07208

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Altman

Defendant

BCD Travel USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carmen David Caruso

Attorney at Carmen D. Caruso Law Firm

77 W. Washington Street, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #3 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Altman (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice) (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/18/2021 at 9:00 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Susan Altman; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17711223.(Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 12/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #3 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Altman (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice) (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/18/2021 at 9:00 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing.Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Susan Altman; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17711223.(Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 12/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmen David Caruso