This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:06:34 (UTC).

Altman Stage Lighting, Inc. v. Smith

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Altman Stage Lighting, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-02575

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Altman Stage Lighting, Inc.

Defendant

Julie Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee A. Pollock

Attorney at Pollock & Maguire, LLC

4 West Red Oak Lane, Suite 302

White Plains, NY 10604

Dawn Portney

Attorney at Pollock & Maguire

4 West Red Oak Lane, Suite 302

White Plains, NY 10607

Defendant Attorneys

Russell Marc Yankwitt

Attorney at Yankwitt LLP

140 Grand Street, Suite 705

White Plains, NY 10601

Cassandra M. Vogel

Attorney at Yankwitt LLP

140 Grand Street, Suite 705

White Plains, NY 10601

Clyde Whittaker Steineker

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue N.

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The application is granted. Julie Smith answer due 5/29/2020. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/15/2020) (rj) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Marc Yankwitt on behalf of Julie Smith..(Yankwitt, Russell) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cassandra M. Vogel on behalf of Julie Smith..(Vogel, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Russell M. Yankwitt dated May 13, 2020. Document filed by Julie Smith..(Yankwitt, Russell) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendant Ms. Julie Smith may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including May 15, 2020. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Defendant Ms. Julie Smith expressly reserves, any and all defenses. There has been no previous request for extension of time in connection with this matter. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc.7). SO ORDERED., Julie Smith answer due 5/15/2020., Motions terminated: #7 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. filed by Julie Smith. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/22/2020) (rj) Modified on 4/29/2020 (rj). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Julie Smith..(Steineker, Clyde) Modified on 5/21/2020 (db). (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Julie Smith served on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Service was accepted by JULIE SMITH. Document filed by Altman Stage Lighting, Inc...(Portney, Dawn) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julie Smith..(pne) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dawn Portney on behalf of Altman Stage Lighting, Inc...(Portney, Dawn) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pollock, Lee) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julie Smith, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Altman Stage Lighting, Inc...(Pollock, Lee) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lee A. Pollock. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Julie Smith. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19239996)Document filed by Altman Stage Lighting, Inc...(Pollock, Lee) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTMAN STAGE LIGHTING CO. INC. DBA ALTMAN LIGHTING INC. is a litigant