This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:20:22 (UTC).

Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC v. Comcast Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Altitude Sports Entertainment, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Comcast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martinez and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03253

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC

Defendants

Comcast Corporation

Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin David Evans

Attorney at Evans Law PLLC

4643 South Ulster Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

Martha Lea Goodman

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP-DC

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

William Anthony Isaacson

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP-DC

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Robert Michael Cooper

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP-DC

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Sean Phillips Rodriguez

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP-San Francisco

44 Montgomery Street, 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Amy Jill Mauser

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP-DC

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan William Cooke

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Christopher Philip Lynch

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP-New York

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-3904

John M. Briggs

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP-New York

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-3904

Arthur J. Burke

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP-New York

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-3904

Kathryn A. Reilly

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

David B. Toscano

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP-New York

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-3904

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) MOTION to Stay Comcasts Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#30

(#30) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Comcasts Motion to Dismiss Altitudes Complaint by Defendants Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#29

(#29) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. (Isaacson, William) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#28

(#28) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Isaacson, William) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information and Firm Affiliation by Kevin David Evans (Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha Lea Goodman on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney Martha Lea Goodman added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Goodman, Martha) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#24

(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. Comcast Corporation served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Jill Mauser on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney Amy Jill Mauser added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Mauser, Amy) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Anthony Isaacson on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney William Anthony Isaacson added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Isaacson, William) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/19/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

4 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney William A. Isaacson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MEMORANDUM regarding #31 MOTION to Stay Comcasts Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Comcast Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/15/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) MOTION to Stay Comcasts Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Decision on Its Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Comcasts Motion to Dismiss Altitudes Complaint by Defendants Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. (Isaacson, William) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Isaacson, William) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #26 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney Kevin D. Evans. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information and Firm Affiliation by Kevin David Evans (Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Martha Lea Goodman on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney Martha Lea Goodman added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Goodman, Martha) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. Comcast Corporation served on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Phillips Rodriguez on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney Sean Phillips Rodriguez added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Rodriguez, Sean) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Jill Mauser on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney Amy Jill Mauser added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Mauser, Amy) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Anthony Isaacson on behalf of Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLCAttorney William Anthony Isaacson added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla) (Isaacson, William) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/19/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#6) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11 /19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/19/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney William A. Isaacson. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Demand For Jury Trial against Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7000314)Attorney Kevin David Evans added to party Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Altitude Sports & Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Evans, Kevin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less