This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2019 at 07:09:55 (UTC).

Tiffni Altes v. Star Brands North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Tiffni Altes filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Star Brands North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04399

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffni Altes

Defendant

Star Brands North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory S Weston

Attorney at Weston Firm

1405 Morena Boulevard Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorneys

John D Alessio

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves and Savitch LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Justin Michael Fontaine

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves and Savitch LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Sean Michael Sullivan

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves and Savitch LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Proposed Order

#12

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE #11 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is GRANTED IN PART as follows: 1. This Action is stayed and placed on the Court's inactive calendar, pending a decision by the Ninth Circuit in McGee v. S-L Snacks Nat'l, LLC, Case No. 17-55577 (the McGee Action), which has been argued and submitted for decision. 2. The parties shall file a joint report as to the status of the McGee Action on the earlier of every 60 days, or within 10 days of the issuance of a decision by the Ninth Circuit. The first 60-day report shall be filed no later than September 16, 2019. 3. Defendant shall file any response to the Complaint within 30 days of when an opinion in the McGee Action becomes final pursuant to the rules of the Ninth Circuit. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending resolution of McGee v. S-L Snacks Natl, LLC filed by Defendant Star Brands North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Sean Michael Sullivan added to party Star Brands North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Tiffni Altes. upon Star Brands North America, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Sean Sullivan. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (lom) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tiffni Altes, (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Star Brands North America, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tiffni Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tiffni Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23778928 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tiffni Altes. (Attorney Gregory S Weston added to party Tiffni Altes(pty:pla))(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Alessio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Fontaine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Michael Sullivan