This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 07:12:49 (UTC).

Steve Altes v. Sambazon, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Steve Altes filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sambazon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01340

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Altes

Defendant

Sambazon, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory S Weston

Attorney at Weston Firm

1405 Morena Boulevard Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING Amended Stipulation to Further Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #12 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendants Sambazon, Inc., may file its responsive pleading to the operative Complaint up to and including 9/11/2019. (jp) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation

#12

(#12) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 11, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation)(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sambazon, Inc. answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes.(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steve Altes, upon Defendant Sambazon, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes, (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#6

(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sambazon, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24046396 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attorney Gregory S Weston added to party Steve Altes(pty:pla))(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER GRANTING Amended Stipulation to Further Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #12 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendants Sambazon, Inc., may file its responsive pleading to the operative Complaint up to and including 9/11/2019. (jp) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 11, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation)(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sambazon, Inc. answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes.(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steve Altes, upon Defendant Sambazon, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes, (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sambazon, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24046396 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attorney Gregory S Weston added to party Steve Altes(pty:pla))(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAMBAZON, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston