This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 07:11:45 (UTC).

Steve Altes v. Conagra Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Steve Altes filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Conagra Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03952

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Altes

Defendant

Conagra Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory S Weston

Attorney at Weston Firm

1405 Morena Boulevard Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Andrew C Hamilton

Attorney at Weston Firm

1405 Morena Boulevard Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, LOCAL RULE 23-3, AND STAY PENDING RELATED APPEAL by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Stipulation #9 , it is hereby ordered that this action is stayed in its entirety pending the resolution of a decision by the Ninth Circuit in McGee v. S-L Snacks. Counsel for Plaintiff shall inform the Court by filing a notice within seven days of the resolution of McGee. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide notice of the resolution of McGee to counsel for Defendant within seven days of the resolution. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint shall be 21 days from the date counsel for Plaintiff provides notice of the resolution of McGee. The time for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification shall be governed by Local Rule 23-3, with the 90 days to begin running from the date counsel for Plaintiff provides notice of the resolution of McGee. (gk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on May 22, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation re Waiver of Service of Process, Local

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Appeal, Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation re Waiver of Service of Process, Local Rule 23-3, and Stay Pending Related Appeal)(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#8

(#8) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Request was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events>Service Documents>Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints>Summons Request.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew C Hamilton on behalf of Plaintiff Steve Altes (Hamilton, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #1

Plaintiff's CLRA Venue Affidavit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23685835 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's CLRA Venue Affidavit) (Attorney Gregory S Weston added to party Steve Altes(pty:pla))(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, LOCAL RULE 23-3, AND STAY PENDING RELATED APPEAL by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Stipulation #9 , it is hereby ordered that this action is stayed in its entirety pending the resolution of a decision by the Ninth Circuit in McGee v. S-L Snacks. Counsel for Plaintiff shall inform the Court by filing a notice within seven days of the resolution of McGee. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide notice of the resolution of McGee to counsel for Defendant within seven days of the resolution. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint shall be 21 days from the date counsel for Plaintiff provides notice of the resolution of McGee. The time for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification shall be governed by Local Rule 23-3, with the 90 days to begin running from the date counsel for Plaintiff provides notice of the resolution of McGee. (gk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #10 served on May 22, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Appeal, Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation re Waiver of Service of Process, Local Rule 23-3, and Stay Pending Related Appeal)(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Request was filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events>Service Documents>Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints>Summons Request.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew C Hamilton on behalf of Plaintiff Steve Altes (Hamilton, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23685835 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Steve Altes. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's CLRA Venue Affidavit) (Attorney Gregory S Weston added to party Steve Altes(pty:pla))(Weston, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conagra Foods Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Christopher Hamilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston