This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 08:06:01 (UTC).

ALTENHOFEN v. ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 ALTENHOFEN filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON ALTENHOFEN

Petitioner

CLEVELAND INTEGRITY SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William F. Goodrich

Attorney at Goodrich & Geist, P.C.

3634 California Ave

Pittsburgh, PA 15212

Carl A. Fitz

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plz, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Joshua P. Geist

Attorney at Goodrich & Geist, P.C.

3634 California Ave

Pittsburgh, PA 15212

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Taylor A. Jones

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Petitioner Attorney

Ryan O. Hemminger

Attorney at Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC

525 William Penn Place, 28Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Brian A Smith

Attorney at Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Aughtry

1200 Smith St, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Annette A. Idalski

Attorney at Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Aughtry

191 Peachtree Street, N.E., 34Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30303

Keith E. Whitson

Attorney at Schnader, Harrison, Segal & Lewis

120 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2700, Fifth Avenue Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-3001

Peter N. Hall

Attorney at Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Aughtry

191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Jason Clark, Chelsea Dogie, Freddy Rojas, Clovis Rushing and Michael Thorpe. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#36

(#36) CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Mark Cagle, Dickie Foster, Brian Matis, Jessie Rosier, Gary Slaid and Douglas Thomas. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

31 #1

Proposed Order

#31

(#31) MOTION to Intervene by CLEVELAND INTEGRITY SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hemminger, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#26

(#37) ORDER. In light of the recent case-reassignment, District Judge Cercone's response-Order (Doc. #26 ) is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff's response to Energy Transfer's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #24 ) - and for any party wishing to respond to CIS's Motion to Intervene (Doc. #31 ) - is 04/23/20. All other aspects of motions practice - and all future motions in this case - will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 4/13/20. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/3/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

24 #3

Proposed Order

24 #2

Affidavit

24 #1

Affidavit

#24

(#37) ORDER. In light of the recent case-reassignment, District Judge Cercone's response-Order (Doc. #26 ) is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff's response to Energy Transfer's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #24 ) - and for any party wishing to respond to CIS's Motion to Intervene (Doc. #31 ) - is 04/23/20. All other aspects of motions practice - and all future motions in this case - will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 4/13/20. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/3/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing

5 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Attorney William R. Liles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/13/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. (cel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5461201), filed by JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (cel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Jason Clark, Chelsea Dogie, Freddy Rojas, Clovis Rushing and Michael Thorpe. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER. In light of the recent case-reassignment, District Judge Cercone's response-Order (Doc. #26 ) is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff's response to Energy Transfer's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #24 ) - and for any party wishing to respond to CIS's Motion to Intervene (Doc. #31 ) - is 04/23/20. All other aspects of motions practice - and all future motions in this case - will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 4/13/20. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/3/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Mark Cagle, Dickie Foster, Brian Matis, Jessie Rosier, Gary Slaid and Douglas Thomas. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/2/20. (jhi) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketJudge Cathy Bissoon added. (jmm) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/1/2020. (kly) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Disclosure Statement identifying Energy Transfer LP as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP.. (Idalski, Annette) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) BRIEF in Support re #31 Motion to Intervene filed by CLEVELAND INTEGRITY SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hemminger, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Intervene by CLEVELAND INTEGRITY SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hemminger, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Goodrich on behalf of JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Goodrich, William) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT TO OPT IN as a class member by Robert Chilcote. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JASON ALTENHOFEN. ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Fitz, Carl) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Attorney Carl A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/14/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Carl A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5467326) by JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Fitz, Carl) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Attorney William R. Liles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/13/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney William R. Liles to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5466510) by JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Liles, William ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. (cel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5461201), filed by JASON ALTENHOFEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (cel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cleveland Integrity Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan O Hemminger