This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2019 at 07:01:16 (UTC).

Altair Logix LLC v. VIA Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Altair Logix LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against VIA Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03664

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Altair Logix LLC

Defendant

VIA Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Randolph Bennett

Steven Anton Nielsen

Defendant Attorney

David Jeanchung Tsai

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Appendix Letter of Good Standing

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/16/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by VIA Technologies, Inc. and Altair Logix LLC(Tsai, David) (Filed on 7/16/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Altair Logix LLC. VIA Technologies, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/11/2019) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by David Bennett. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Altair Logix LLC.. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/3/2019) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent infringement. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to VIA Technologies, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019

Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by David Bennett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13464063.) filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Letter of Good Standing)(Bennett, David) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by Altair Logix LLC . (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Altair Logix LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Altair Logix LLC. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Altair Logix LLC re 4:19 1596 HSG & 3:19 3662 HSG (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2019) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against VIA Technologies, Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13463628.). Filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less