This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 11:04:39 (UTC).

Altair Logix LLC v. Advantech Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Altair Logix LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advantech Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01596

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Altair Logix LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Advantech Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David Randolph Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP law

P. O. Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614-0184

Steven Anton Nielsen

100 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 216

Larkspur, CA 94939

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Harold H. Davis, Jr.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Min Wu

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jay Chiu

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1 Park Plaza, Twelfth Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

26 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#26

(#26) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to move Case Management Conference filed by Advantech Corporation and Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#25

(#25) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#24

(#24) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/5/2019) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#23

(#23) ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byAltair Logix LLC. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#22

(#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by Advantech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Advantech Automation Corp (BVI), Other Affiliate Advantech Corp. Ltd. for Advantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#21

(#21) Certificate of Interested Entities by Advantech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Advantech Automation Corp (BVI), Other Affiliate Advantech Corp. Ltd. for Advantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#20

(#20) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Advantech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Advantech Automation Corp (BVI), Other Affiliate Advantech Corp. Ltd. for Advantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Altair Logix LLC byAdvantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#8

(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David R. Bennett representing Plaintiff Altair Logix LLC. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Letter of Good Standing

#6

(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David R. Bennett representing Plaintiff Altair Logix LLC. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Altair Logix LLC . (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Altair Logix LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Altair Logix LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Altair Logix LLC. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Advantech Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13207461.). Filed byAltair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to move Case Management Conference filed by Advantech Corporation and Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 7/5/2019) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byAltair Logix LLC. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by Advantech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Advantech Automation Corp (BVI), Other Affiliate Advantech Corp. Ltd. for Advantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Certificate of Interested Entities by Advantech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Advantech Automation Corp (BVI), Other Affiliate Advantech Corp. Ltd. for Advantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Advantech Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Advantech Automation Corp (BVI), Other Affiliate Advantech Corp. Ltd. for Advantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Altair Logix LLC byAdvantech Corporation. (Davis, Harold) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #17 Stipulation to Move CMC to July 30, 2019 at 2 PM. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2019 and Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Move CMC to July 30, 2019 at 2 PM re #9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by Altair Logix LLC. and Advantech Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Advantech Corporation. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David R. Bennett representing Plaintiff Altair Logix LLC. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13208059.) filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Bennett, David) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Altair Logix LLC . (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Altair Logix LLC (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Altair Logix LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Altair Logix LLC. (Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Advantech Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13207461.). Filed byAltair Logix LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nielsen, Steven) (Filed on 3/27/2019) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advantech Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Altair Logix LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Anton Nielsen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Bennett