This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2020 at 10:03:20 (UTC).

Alston v. www.calculator.com et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 Alston filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against www calculator com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23013

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chloe Tsakiris Alston

Defendants

GoDaddy.com, LLC

Registrant Unknown

www.calculator.com

Stands4 LTD

Unknown Registrant

Ruth Yakobzon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rafael Recalde

Attorney at Recalde Law Firm, P.A.

10800 Biscayne Blvd, Ste 988

Miami, FL 33161

Geremy Seth Klein

Attorney at Recalde Law Firm, P.A.

10800 Biscayne Blvd, Suite 988

Miami, FL 33161

Defendant Attorneys

Ari S. Meltzer

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

David E. Weslow

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Joan Carlos Wizel

Attorney at Lydecker Diaz

1221 Brickell Avenue, 19Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

35 #1

ORDER

#35

#34

#33

#32

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#31

#30

#8

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 ORDER) (ebz) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Order Authorizing Release of Cash Deposit and Cancelling Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, DE#31 , is GRANTED. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction that is currently scheduled for August 17, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELED, based upon the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant Stands4 LTD, DE#30 , and Plaintiffs stated intent to voluntarily dismiss this action. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case for administrative purposes. The Plaintiff shall file a notice of a voluntary dismissal once the funds are released. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STANDS4 LTD. The Stipulation, DE#30 is APPROVED. All claims asserted against Defendant Stands4 LTD in the above-styled matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The above-styled case shall proceed against all other Defendants and all deadlines shall remain in effect. The temporary restraining order, DE#8 , is no longer in effect againstDefendant Stands4 LTD. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) AFFIDAVIT /Declaration signed by: Rafael Recalde re #31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Release of Funds and to Cancel Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chloe Tsakiris Alston (Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Plaintiff's MOTION for Release of Funds and to Cancel Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chloe Tsakiris Alston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Stands4 LTD with prejudice by Chloe Tsakiris Alston (Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Clerks Notice to Filer re #26 Stipulation. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AFFIDAVIT /Declaration signed by: Rafael Recalde re #26 Stipulation, by Chloe Tsakiris Alston (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Joint Request to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Postpone Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time, DE#26 , is GRANTED. The Temporary Restraining Order, DE#8 , shall remain in effect until August 17, 2020. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Beth Bloom. Re: #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chloe Tsakiris Alston. Responses due by 8/13/2020 Replies due by 8/14/2020. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and to Postpone Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #8 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Chloe Tsakiris Alston (Recalde, Rafael) Modified to add motion relief on 8/6/2020 (jas). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Set Aside #8 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, (EXPEDITED) by Stands4 LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ben Efrain Declaration)(Wizel, Joan) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joan Carlos Wizel on behalf of Stands4 LTD. Attorney Joan Carlos Wizel added to party Stands4 LTD(pty:dft). (Wizel, Joan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A video conference hearing on Plaintiffs Application is set for Friday, August 7, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The purpose of the hearing shall be to determine whether this Temporary Restraining Order should be made a Preliminary Injunction pending full trial on the merits. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 8/7/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual.Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (jas) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT /Declaration signed by: Nicholas Tsakiris Alston re #5 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION Ex Parte Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Chloe Tsakiris Alston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Expedited Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Chloe Tsakiris Alston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Recalde, Rafael). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 7/22/2020 (jas). (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ebz) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13217518, filed by Chloe Tsakiris Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Godaddy, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rafael Recalde