This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 09:06:01 (UTC).

Alston v. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Alston filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Baltimore Gas Electric Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02317

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Alston

Defendants

International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410

Exelon Corporation

Exelon Business Services Company, LLC

Baltimore Gas & Electric Company

Patrick Gilden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tonya M Bana

Attorney at Tonya Bana LLC

129 Slade Avenue

Pikesville, MD 21208

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Douglas Starr

Attorney at Abato Rubenstein and Abato PA

809 Gleneagles Ct Ste 320

Towson, MD 21286

Charles T Joyce

230 S. Broad St.

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Kaiser H Chowdhry

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Julia S Sturniolo

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

1701 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Remand by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410.(Joyce, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

27 #6

Exhibit Exhibit B-1

27 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B

27 #4

Exhibit Exhibit A-3

27 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A-2

27 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A-1

27 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#27

(#27) MOTION to Remand by Kevin Alston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-1)(Bana, Tonya) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#26

(#26) Correspondence re: Requesting the Granting of Motions to Dismiss (Joyce, Charles) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.5(a)(Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Consent to Removal

1 #5

Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit D - Circuit Court Docket Report

1 #3

Exhibit C - Case Information Report

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-002543. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8801833), filed by Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit D - Circuit Court Docket Report, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #27 MOTION to Remand . Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/7/2020. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Remand by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410.(Joyce, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Remand by Kevin Alston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-1)(Bana, Tonya) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Correspondence re: Requesting the Granting of Motions to Dismiss (Joyce, Charles) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #24 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Kevin Alston. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/24/2020. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REQUEST for Extension of Time to File (Bana, Tonya) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/19/2020. (Gallagher, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Alston.(Bana, Tonya) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/11/2020. (Gallagher, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/13/2020. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint, by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410(Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE re #4 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410.(Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles T. Joyce (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8806222.) by Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410(Starr, Paul) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Douglas Starr on behalf of Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410 (Starr, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/11/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Baltimore Gas & Electric Company, Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Patrick Gilden, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union 410, filed by Kevin Alston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report)(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.5(a)(Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24-C-20-002543. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8801833), filed by Exelon Business Services Company, LLC, Exelon Corporation, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Case Information Report, #4 Exhibit D - Circuit Court Docket Report, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chowdhry, Kaiser) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXELON BUSINESS SERVICES COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Baltimore Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases where International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 139 is a litigant

Latest cases where Exelon Corporation is a litigant