This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2022 at 08:31:43 (UTC).

Alston Construction Company, Inc., a California Corporation v. Impact Construction Services Division I, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 Alston Construction Company, Inc , a California Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Impact Construction Services Division I, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05586

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alston Construction Company, Inc.

Defendant

Impact Construction Services Division I, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Evan Daniels

Todd Michael Murphy

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alston Construction Company, Inc., a California Corporation by Richard Evan Daniels (Daniels, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 12/13/2022 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Corportate Disclosure Statement by Alston Construction Company, Inc. (Murphy, Todd) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#5

(#5) STATUS Report by Alston Construction Company, Inc. (Murphy, Todd) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS Report by Alston Construction Company, Inc. (Murphy, Todd) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Impact Construction Services Division I, LLC (jk2, ) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corportate Disclosure Statement by Alston Construction Company, Inc. (Murphy, Todd) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 12/13/2022 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alston Construction Company, Inc., a California Corporation by Richard Evan Daniels (Daniels, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Alston Construction Company, Inc., a California Corporation; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19934137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Todd) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less