This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:35:22 (UTC).

Alsikafi v. ANCO Insulations Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 Alsikafi filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ANCO Insulations Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00244

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Majeed Alsikafi

Defendants

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP

Certainteed Coporation

State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University Agricultural and Mechanical College

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company

Eagle Inc

Johnson & Johnson

McCarty Corporation

Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Inc.

Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation

Union Carbide Corporation

Honeywell International, Inc.

The Sherwin-Williams Company

ANCO Insulations Inc

Sears, Roebuck and Company

Chevron USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen F. Drew

Attorney at Adams & Reese - N.O.

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Patrick Joseph Schepens

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr & Smith

#3 Sanctuary Blvd, Suite 301

Mandeville, LA 70471

William Glenn Burns

Attorney at Gaudry, Ranson, Higgins & Gremillion, LLC

401 Whitney Avenue, Suite 500

Gretna, LA 70056

Richard J. Garvey, Jr

Attorney at Hailey McNamara Hall Larmann & Papale LLC

One Galleria Blvd, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Janice Marie Culotta

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas R. Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Claire A. Noonan

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kim E. Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meera Unnithan Sossamon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

P. O. Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

Patrick D. Roquemore

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

P. O. Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator and Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Perrey S. Lee

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kathleen Jordan

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras St., Ste 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner Richeson

1615 Poydras St., Ste. 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

David M. Stein

Attorney at Pugh Accardo

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Dwight C. Paulsen, III

Attorney at Bradley Murchison Kelly & Shea LLC

2700 Energy Centre, 1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163-2700

Lionel David Adams

Attorney at Bradley Murchison Kelly & Shea

1100 Poydras St., Ste. 2700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163-1132

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

18 #4

Exhibit

18 #3

Exhibit

18 #2

Exhibit

18 #1

Exhibit

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(ELW) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

13 #4

Attachment Appendix

13 #3

Exhibit A

13 #2

Memorandum in Support

#13

(#13) MOTION to Remand by Majeed Alsikafi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Attachment Appendix)(Donahue, Roshawn) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit B -- Part 4

1 #6

Exhibit B -- Part 3

1 #5

Exhibit B -- Part 2

1 #4

Exhibit B -- Part 1

1 #3

Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record Part 3

1 #2

Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record Part 2

1 #1

Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record Part 1

#1

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(ELW) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk is directed to file R. Docs. 16-1 through 16-7 into the record.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The Sherwin-Williams Company is dismissed, without prejudice, and with each party to bear its own costs, specifically reserving to Plaintiffs all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors and other persons and/or entities whether named or unnamed in the captioned matter. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 5/29/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION of Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice of The Sherwin-Williams Company by Majeed Alsikafi. (Donahue, Roshawn) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit docket text(KMW). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Remand by Majeed Alsikafi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Attachment Appendix)(Donahue, Roshawn) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original and First Supplemental and Amended Petitions for damages and Request Jury Trial by Johnson & Johnson.(Benach, Carlos) Modified on 5/23/2019 to edit text (ELW). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Statement Pursuant to BR 9027(e)(3) by Majeed Alsikafi (Donahue, Roshawn) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice from the JPML Panel that case not appropriate for inclusion in MDL. (SWE) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Johnson & Johnson answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KAH) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter to Attorney John Dennis Person regarding Courtney H. Payton who is Co-Counsel for party Imerys Talc America, Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter to Attorney Michael H. Abraham regarding Tim Gray who is Co-Counsel for party Chevron USA, Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to Attorney Roshawn H. Donahue regarding Alex S. Dunn, Jr. who is Co-Counsel for party Majeed Alsikafi. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-672865. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931502), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record Part 1, #2 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record Part 2, #3 Exhibit A -- Certified State Court Record Part 3, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #6 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #7 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.