This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 09:38:00 (UTC).

ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Snyder et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 ALPS Property Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Snyder. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00859

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Pacific Coast Family Law PLLC

The Law Office of Mara Snyder PLLC

Mara A Snyder

Robert Keith McKay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Lether

Attorney at LETHER LAW GROUP

1848 Westlake Ave N Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Eric J Neal

Attorney at LETHER LAW GROUP

1848 Westlake Ave N Ste 100

Seattle, WA 98109

Defendant Attorney

Brian Joel Waid

Attorney at WAID LAW OFFICE

5400 California Ave Sw, Ste D

Seattle, WA 98136

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY, filed by Defendant Robert Keith McKay, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

14 #5

Exhibit E

14 #4

Exhibit D

14 #3

Exhibit C

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of Eric J. Neal filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company, to #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mara Snyder on 8/5/2021, filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pacific Coast Family Law on 8/5/2021, filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Robert McKay on 7/18/2021, filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Brian J. Waid in Support of Defendant Robert McKay's Brillhart Motion to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification filed by Defendant Robert Keith McKay re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

8 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendant McKay's Brillhart Motion to Dismiss

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification, filed by Defendant Robert Keith McKay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant McKay's Brillhart Motion to Dismiss)(Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/17/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/24/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Brian Joel Waid for Defendant Robert Keith McKay from July 26-29, 2021; August 4-10, 2021; and August 30 - September 9, 2021. (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Joel Waid on behalf of Defendant Robert Keith McKay. (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY, filed by Defendant Robert Keith McKay, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Eric J. Neal filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company, to #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mara Snyder on 8/5/2021, filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pacific Coast Family Law on 8/5/2021, filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Robert McKay on 7/18/2021, filed by Plaintiff ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Brian J. Waid in Support of Defendant Robert McKay's Brillhart Motion to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification filed by Defendant Robert Keith McKay re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss or Stay, with Meet and Confer Certification, filed by Defendant Robert Keith McKay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant McKay's Brillhart Motion to Dismiss)(Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/17/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/24/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Brian Joel Waid for Defendant Robert Keith McKay from July 26-29, 2021; August 4-10, 2021; and August 30 - September 9, 2021. (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Joel Waid on behalf of Defendant Robert Keith McKay. (Waid, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ALPS Corporation for ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/6/2021. (SG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7141188) Attorney Thomas Lether added to party ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lether, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Joel Waid