This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:54:10 (UTC).

ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Edenfield et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 ALPS Property Casualty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Edenfield. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04226

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

Sharon Edenfield

Edenfiled & Cox, P.C. doing business as Edenfield Cox & Bruce

Allison Phillips

Edenfield Cox & Bruce

Edenfield Law, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Jackson Harris

Attorney at Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC

Suite 500, 200 Ashford Center North

Atlanta, GA 30338-2668

Kim M. Jackson

Attorney at Bovis, Kyle, Burch & Medlin, LLC

Suite 500, 200 Ashford Center North

Atlanta, GA 30338-2668

Defendant Attorneys

Jenny Elizabeth Jensen

Attorney at The Jensen Firm A D/B/A For Jenny E. Jensen, PC

3460 Summit Ridge Parkway, Suite 303, 30096

Duluth, GA 30096

Warren R. Hinds

Attorney at Office of Warren R. Hinds

1303 Macy Drive, Crossville Village Office Park

Roswell, GA 30076

Linley Jones

Attorney at Linley Jones, P.C.

3455 Peachtree Rd. Ne, Suite 675

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are granted a twenty-one (21) day extension up to and including January 4, 2021 to file their responsive pleadings, including but not limited to motions to dismiss, and/or answer and defenses, to ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company's (ALPS) Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/11/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

16 #2

Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit Positive Covid-19 Test

#16

(#16) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Sharon Edenfield, Edenfield Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Positive Covid-19 Test, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Jenny) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Edenfield Cox & Bruce. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Edenfield Law, LLC. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Sharon Edenfield. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Jackson, Kim) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

(#2) EIGHTH AMENDED ORDER IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (kt) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #18

Exhibit 17

1 #15

Exhibit 14

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are granted a twenty-one (21) day extension up to and including January 4, 2021 to file their responsive pleadings, including but not limited to motions to dismiss, and/or answer and defenses, to ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company's (ALPS) Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/11/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant Allison Phillips ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment by Allison Phillips. Discovery ends on 5/10/2021.(Jones, Linley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Sharon Edenfield, Edenfield Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Positive Covid-19 Test, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Jenny) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Sharon Edenfield waiver mailed on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020; Edenfield Law, LLC waiver mailed on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Jackson, Kim) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPlease be advised that Charlotte Diggs, Courtroom Deputy to Chief Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., has had to take leave and may be absent from the courthouse for several weeks. Effective immediately all communications related to cases assigned to Judge Thrash should be directed to Mr. Sam Johnston, who will be serving as interim Courtroom Deputy for Judge Thrash pending the return of Ms. Diggs. Mr. Johnstons telephone number is 706-378-4084, and his email is Sam_Johnston@gand.uscourts.gov. (ddm) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Warren R. Hinds on behalf of Edenfiled & Cox, P.C. (Hinds, Warren) (Entered: 10/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Edenfiled & Cox, P.C. waiver mailed on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Jackson, Kim) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent ALPS Corporation for ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Harris, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of defendant Edenfield Cox & Bruce pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). Each party shall bear its own costs and expenses of litigation. (kt) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Edenfield Cox & Bruce filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Harris, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allison Phillips. Allison Phillips waiver mailed on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Jones, Linley) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Allison Phillips. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Edenfiled & Cox, P.C. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Edenfield Cox & Bruce. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Edenfield Law, LLC. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sharon Edenfield. (kt) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Jackson, Kim) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EIGHTH AMENDED ORDER IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (kt) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10256311) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 17)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jenny Elizabeth Jensen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Warren R. Hinds