This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 09:06:51 (UTC).

Thuy Thanh Alonzo v. Torrid LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Thuy Thanh Alonzo filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Torrid LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07302

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thuy Thanh Alonzo

Defendants

Torrid LLC

Does 1 to 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Binyamin I Manoucheri

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wislhire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jasmine Behroozan

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Hayley Singer Grunvald

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130-2006

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Torrid LLC. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#9

(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, upon Defendant Torrid LLC served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Torrid LLC answer now due 11/10/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Torrid LLC.(Attorney Hayley Singer Grunvald added to party Torrid LLC(pty:dft))(Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

13 #13

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 10, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Torrid LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Torrid LLC answer now due 11/10/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Torrid LLC.(Attorney Hayley Singer Grunvald added to party Torrid LLC(pty:dft))(Grunvald, Hayley) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, upon Defendant Torrid LLC served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Torrid LLC. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31968991 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Thuy Thanh Alonzo(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Torrid LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hayley Singer Grunvald