This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 06:11:10 (UTC).

Thuy Thanh Alonzo v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Thuy Thanh Alonzo filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06202

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thuy Thanh Alonzo

Defendants

Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.

Does 1 to 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Binyamin I Manoucheri

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm PLC

3055 Wislhire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jasmine Behroozan

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle E Vallone

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

1 Market Street Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Stephanie A Sheridan

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Surya Kundu

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

One Market Street Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #2

Proof of Service

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Proof of Service

11 #11

Main Document

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. It is hereby ordered that the last day for Defendant to file a response to the Complaint is extended from September 23, 2021 until and including October 25, 2021. (iv) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3) filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Stephanie A Sheridan added to party Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, upon Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. (et) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo, identifying Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31726912 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Thuy Thanh Alonzo. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party Thuy Thanh Alonzo(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Sheridan