This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2020 at 11:36:52 (UTC).

Alonzo et al v. Welch et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Alonzo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Welch. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Mary Ann Vial Lemmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Karla Price

Latisha M. Alonzo

Defendants

Logistics of Nevada

Protective Insurance Company

Charlesa K Welch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Clary, Jr.

Attorney at Clary & Associates

406 N. 4Th Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Christopher S. Suba

Attorney at Clary & Associates

406 N. 4Th Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Casey Dale Neale

Attorney at Clary & Associates

406 N. 4Th Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Christopher Thomas Freyder

Attorney at Clary, Suba, and Neale

406 N. 4Th Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Guy D. Perrier

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste, LLC

365 Canal Street, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dustin L. Poche

Attorney at Perrier & Lacoste, LLC

365 Canal Street, Suite 2550

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 11/27/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 3:30 PM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(sbs) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference reset for 3/25/2020 at 1:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (sbs) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Logistics of Nevada, Protective Insurance Company, Charlesa K Welch.(Poche, Dustin) Modified text, added link on 2/28/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit 7

1 #12

Exhibit 6

1 #11

Exhibit 5

1 #10

Exhibit 4

1 #9

Exhibit 3

1 #8

Exhibit 2

1 #7

Exhibit 1

1 #6

Notice of Compliance with Removal

1 #5

Exhibit A - State Court Record

1 #3

Certificate of Filing

1 #2

Verification

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with jury demand, from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, Case Number 2019-13148 L-6 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8150453) filed by Logistics of Nevada, Charlesa K Welch, Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 List of Attorneys and Parties, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #6 Notice of Compliance with Removal, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7)Attorney Dustin L. Poche added to party Logistics of Nevada(pty:dft), Attorney Dustin L. Poche added to party Protective Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Dustin L. Poche added to party Charlesa K Welch(pty:dft).(Poche, Dustin) (Attachments 1, 5 and 7 replaced on 2/14/2020) (sbs). Modified text on 2/14/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery must be completed by 11/27/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 3:30 PM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(sbs) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference reset for 3/25/2020 at 1:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (sbs) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Logistics of Nevada, Protective Insurance Company, Charlesa K Welch.(Poche, Dustin) Modified text, added link on 2/28/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Protective Insurance Company identifying corporate parent Protective Insurance Corporation. (Poche, Dustin) Modified text, added corporate parent on 2/18/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Logistics of Nevada (Poche, Dustin) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: Because R. Doc. #1 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with jury demand, from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, Case Number 2019-13148 L-6 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8150453) filed by Logistics of Nevada, Charlesa K Welch, Protective Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Certificate of Filing, #4 List of Attorneys and Parties, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #6 Notice of Compliance with Removal, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7)Attorney Dustin L. Poche added to party Logistics of Nevada(pty:dft), Attorney Dustin L. Poche added to party Protective Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Dustin L. Poche added to party Charlesa K Welch(pty:dft).(Poche, Dustin) (Attachments 1, 5 and 7 replaced on 2/14/2020) (sbs). Modified text on 2/14/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Poche

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Guy D. Perrier