This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:09:37 (UTC).

Alonso v. Cardenas Markets, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Alonso filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cardenas Markets, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer A. Dorsey and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irene Alonso

Defendant

Cardenas Markets, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald P. Paradiso

Attorney at Ladah Law Firm

517 S. 3Rd St.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Ramzy P Ladah

Attorney at Ladah Law Firm

517 S. 3Rd Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P Lowry

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Jonathan C. Pattillo

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

6689 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89119

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-845060-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6766564) by Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Answer, #4 Cardenas' Jury Demand, #5 Arb Petition) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint

1 #3

Answer

1 #4

Cardenas' Jury Demand

1 #5

Arb Petition

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardenas Markets, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Cardenas Markets, Inc., Corporate Parent NMFP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Train Investment Trust for Cardenas Markets, LLC added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/20/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/4/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Irene Alonso. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#6

(#6) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #6 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order - Discovery due by 7/18/2022. Motions due by 8/17/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/4/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION and Order to Remand by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, certified copy of order and docket to 8th JD court - DRS) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, certified copy of order and docket to 8th JD court - DRS) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION and Order to Remand by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #6 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order - Discovery due by 7/18/2022. Motions due by 8/17/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/4/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Irene Alonso. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/20/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/4/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardenas Markets, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Cardenas Markets, Inc., Corporate Parent NMFP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Train Investment Trust for Cardenas Markets, LLC added. (Lowry, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-845060-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6766564) by Cardenas Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Answer, #4 Cardenas' Jury Demand, #5 Arb Petition) (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARDENAS MARKETS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan C. Pattillo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P Lowry