This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2019 at 07:34:24 (UTC).

Alonso et al v. Western World Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Alonso against Western World Insurance Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-23827

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

Referral Judge

Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michelle Alonso

Michael Alonso

Defendant

Western World Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose Pete Font

Attorney at Font & Nelson, LLC

200 S. Andrews Ave., Suite 501

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Frantz C Nelson

Attorney at Vernis & Bowling of Broward, PA

5821 Hollywood Blvd., 1St Floor

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Troy Jonathan Seibert

Attorney at Butler Legal

400 N. Ashley Drive, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Maxwell Harrison Stape

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig

400 N. Ashley Dr., Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/4/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michael Alonso, Michelle Alonso (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Font, Jose) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Western World Insurance Company re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western World Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG for Western World Insurance Company (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT re Removal by Western World Insurance Company (Stape, Maxwell) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 4 of 9

1 #9

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 5 of 9

1 #6

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 2 of 9

1 #7

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 3 of 9

1 #12

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 8 of 9

1 #13

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 9 of 9

1 #10

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 6 of 9

1 #11

Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 7 of 9

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11981875, filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Maxwell H. Stape Esquire in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 1 of 9, #6 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 2 of 9, #7 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 3 of 9, #8 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 4 of 9, #9 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 5 of 9, #10 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 6 of 9, #11 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 7 of 9, #12 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 8 of 9, #13 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 9 of 9)(Stape, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories to Plaintiff

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/4/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michael Alonso, Michelle Alonso (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Font, Jose) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Western World Insurance Company re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western World Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG for Western World Insurance Company (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATUS REPORT re Removal by Western World Insurance Company (Stape, Maxwell) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11981875, filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Maxwell H. Stape Esquire in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 1 of 9, #6 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 2 of 9, #7 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 3 of 9, #8 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 4 of 9, #9 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 5 of 9, #10 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 6 of 9, #11 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 7 of 9, #12 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 8 of 9, #13 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 9 of 9)(Stape, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.