This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2019 at 07:42:27 (UTC).

AlmondNet, Inc. et al v. Oath Holdings Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 AlmondNet, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Oath Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

Datonics, LLC

Intent IQ, LLC

AlmondNet, Inc.

Defendants

Yahoo Inc.

Oath Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#134

(#134) STIPULATION of Dismissal by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#133

(#133) ORDER Granting #132 MOTION to Amend Caption [Unopposed] filed by Intent IQ, LLC, AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/19. (ntl) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

132 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#132

(#132) MOTION to Amend Caption [Unopposed] - filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#131

(#131) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

130 #1

*Restricted*

#130

(#130) Record of case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 1:16-cv-01557. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#129

(#129) MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, I direct that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, confident in the belief that the interest of justice requires it. The Clerk of the Court is directed to take the necessary actions to accomplish the transfer. Case transferred to District of Delaware. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/5/2018.Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#128

(#128) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/20/2018: Counsel for all parties present. A conference was held. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #9

Exhibit D-1

1 #8

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit B-1

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A-1

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8493274 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Intent IQ, LLC, Datonics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit I-1, #16 Exhibit J) (Carmody, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)

374 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • CASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) STIPULATION of Dismissal by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) ORDER Granting #132 MOTION to Amend Caption [Unopposed] filed by Intent IQ, LLC, AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/19. (ntl) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) MOTION to Amend Caption [Unopposed] - filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) Record of case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 1:16-cv-01557. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, I direct that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, confident in the belief that the interest of justice requires it. The Clerk of the Court is directed to take the necessary actions to accomplish the transfer. Case transferred to District of Delaware. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/5/2018.Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/20/2018: Counsel for all parties present. A conference was held. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • NOTICE: A status conference will be held on 11/20/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 8B South before Judge I. Leo Glasser. (Kessler, Stanley) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave for Ian B. Crosby to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/6/2016. (Vasquez, Lea) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ian B. Crosby Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8511596. by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Crosby, Ian) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) #6 Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Approved by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 4/5/2016. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically of $400 for filing of the Complaint by AlmondNet, Inc., Datonics, LLC, Intent IQ, LLC. (Carmody, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit b, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D 1, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit I 1, #15 Exhibit J) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/31/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8493274 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by AlmondNet, Inc., Intent IQ, LLC, Datonics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit D-1, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit I-1, #16 Exhibit J) (Carmody, William) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 03/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Intent IQ, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AlmondNet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oath Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Yahoo! Inc. is a litigant