This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 08:26:48 (UTC).

Almirall, LLC v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Almirall, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and Irene M. Keeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Thomas S. Kleeh

Irene M. Keeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Almirall, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

R.J. Shea

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010-6035

James F. Companion

Attorney at Schrader Companion Duff & Law, PLLC

401 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

James S. Trainor, Jr.

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Rebecca A.E. Fewkes

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - California

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Sandra K. Law

Attorney at Schrader Companion Duff & Law, PLLC

401 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

Elizabeth B. Hagan, Ph.D.

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP - Seattle

1191 Second Avenue, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Richard J. Shea

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010-6035

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

William J O'Brien

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Gordon H. Copland

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Lance A Soderstrom

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Alissa M. Pacchioli

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP - NC

550 S. Tryon Street, Suite 2900

Charlotte, NC 28202

Deepro R. Mukerjee

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (wrr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/10/2020 with correct doucment) (wrr). NEF regenerated. Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/10/2020 with correct document) (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 01/11/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

21 #1

Proposed Order

29 #1

Proposed Order

#32

(#32) Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Other Document re #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Almirall, LLC. (Companion, James) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#27

(#27) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc... (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#31

(#31) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alissa M. Pacchioli for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/6/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Almirall, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Almirall S.A. for Almirall, LLC.. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorneys Trainor, Shea, Hagan and Fewkes. (wrr) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Almirall, LLC. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Almirall, LLC by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Almirall, LLC by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#29

(#29) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Alissa M. Pacchioli) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A-Patent Information

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/30/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#30

RESTRICTED

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Other Document re #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Almirall, LLC. (Companion, James) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alissa M. Pacchioli for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/6/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as tp Alissa M. Pacchioli: PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002856. (wrr) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Alissa M. Pacchioli) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#28) PAPERLESS ORDER (The Scheduling Conference, previously scheduled for 4/10/2020, is RESCHEDULED to 4/13/2020, 02:30 PM, before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. All other deadlines established in the First Order remain in effect.) Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/4/2020. (cml) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc... (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Almirall, LLC by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Brien, William) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/30/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Lance A Soderstrom for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/30/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PHV Filing fee as to Lance A. Soderstrom and Deepro R. Mukerjee: PAID $400.00, receipt number WVNC002849 (wrr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca A.E. Fewkes by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/13/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/27/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2020 01:30 PM from judge's chambers via telephone, unless otherwise determined, before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/13/2020. (wrr) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct location of scheduling conference (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/13/2020. (wrr) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William) (Entered: 01/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorneys Trainor, Shea, Hagan and Fewkes. (wrr) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Almirall, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Almirall S.A. for Almirall, LLC.. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (wrr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/10/2020 with correct doucment) (wrr). NEF regenerated. Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/10/2020 with correct document) (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Almirall, LLC. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002360. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Patent Information, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.