This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2023 at 08:54:50 (UTC).

ALMAHAINI v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 ALMAHAINI filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03621

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REDA ALMAHAINI

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

UR JADDOU

TED H. KIM

HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE

IRVIN GADSON

MATTHEW D. EMRICH

CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis G. Jubran

Attorney at ABUSHARAR & ASSOCIATES

501 N Brookhurst Street, Suite 202

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by REDA ALMAHAINI (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#13

(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 12/8/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#12

(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2023. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR JADDOU served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRVIN GADSON served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/8/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

2 #2

Main Document

1 #7

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by REDA ALMAHAINI (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 12/8/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2023. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR JADDOU served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRVIN GADSON served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/7/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/8/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9709673) filed by REDA ALMAHAINI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant