This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2022 at 17:52:44 (UTC).

Ally Financial Inc. v. U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Ally Financial Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against U S Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leonard P. Stark and Mary Pat Thynge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Leonard P. Stark

Mary Pat Thynge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Financial Inc.

Defendants

U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

Illinois National Insurance Company

Markel Bermuda Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexandria Phyllis Murphy

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian M. Rostocki

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1201 Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Courtney Horrigan

David M. Halbreich

Miranda A. Jannuzzi

Robert J. Tritschler

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Joseph A. Bailey, III

Raymond D. Pinkham

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER Approving Magistrate Consent submitted by parties. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/12/22. (ntl) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#19

(#19) VAC Magistrate Consent completed by the parties filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#18

(#18) REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ally Financial Inc. as to Illinois National Insurance Company (Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#16

(#16) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/24/2022. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

11 #2

Certification Pursuant to D. Del. Local Rule 7.1.1

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Houston Casualty Company, Other Affiliates Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Illium, Inc., HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Tokio Marine HCC, and Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (twk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-11-00222-MMJ-CCLD (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3782931)- filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Approving Magistrate Consent submitted by parties. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/12/22. (ntl) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) VAC Magistrate Consent completed by the parties filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Phillips, John) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ally Financial Inc. as to Illinois National Insurance Company (Rostocki, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (ntl) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket(#15) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-3 (March 16, 2022), which are available on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant Order, no later than fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any order referring any part of this case to a Magistrate Judge is VACATED. Unless the parties consent to having a Magistrate Judge handle this case, a referral order will be entered to permit a Magistrate Judge (to be selected by the Court) to do only the following: (a) adjudicate discovery (including fact and expert discovery) and protective order disputes; (b) issue or modify a scheduling order; (c) review stipulated orders and pro hac vice motions; and (d) review requests for mediation in cases other than patent and securities cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any scheduling order that has been entered in this case is AMENDED such as follows: (a) the dates for any motions hearings are VACATED; and (b) the dates for any claim construction hearings are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 3/30/22. (ntl) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (ntl) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/24/2022. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for U.S. Specialty to submit its answering brief in opposition to Ally's Motion to Remand (D.I. 11) and the deadline for Ally to submit its reply brief in support of its Motion to Remand to March 17, 2022 and April 7, 2022 - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/24/2022. (etg) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for U.S. Specialty to submit its answering brief in opposition to Ally's Motion to Remand (D.I. 11) and the deadline for Ally to submit its reply brief in support of its Motion to Remand to March 17, 2022 and April 7, 2022 - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph A. Bailey, III for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Raymond D. Pinkham for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Bailey, III and Raymond D. Pinkham filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/24/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant U.S. Specialty to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 8, 2022 filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/24/22. (ntl) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant U.S. Specialty to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 8, 2022 - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Bilson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph A. Bailey, III and Raymond D. Pinkham - filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph A. Bailey III, #2 Certification of Raymond D. Pinkham)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Houston Casualty Company, Other Affiliates Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Illium, Inc., HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Tokio Marine HCC, and Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (twk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N21C-11-00222-MMJ-CCLD (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3782931)- filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Markel Bermuda Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant