Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2019 at 20:42:25 (UTC).

Ally Bank v. Webster et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Ally Bank filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Webster. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is William K. Sessions III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William K. Sessions III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ally Bank

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Best Friends Animal Society

Best Friends Animal Sanctuary

Stephen W. Webster

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Shannon E. Lamb, Esq.

Attorney at Pratt Vreeland Kennelly Martin & White, Ltd.

64 North Main Street, P.O. Box 280

Rutland, VT 05702-0280

John J. Kennelly, Esq.

Attorney at Pratt Vreeland Kennelly Martin & White, Ltd.

64 North Main Street, P.O. Box 280

Rutland, VT 05702-0280

Elizabeth S. Flowers, Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

222 Central Park Avenue, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

John C. Lynch, Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

222 Central Park Avenue, Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

P. Scott McGee, III, Esq.

Attorney at Hershenson, Carter, Scott & McGee, P.C.

P.O. Box 909

Norwich, VT 05055

Micaela Tucker, Esq.

Attorney at Hershenson, Carter, Scott & McGee, P.C.

P.O. Box 909

Norwich, VT 05055

Clint Hansen, Esq.

Attorney at Fabian VanCott

215 South State Street, Suite 1200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2323

Stephen D. Ellis, Esq.

Attorney at Paul Frank + Collins PC

1 Church Street, P.O. Box 1307

Burlington, VT 05402-1307

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Audio Recording of the October 15 2018 Windsor Probate Division Hearing by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#53

(#53) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Estate's Third Supplemental Disclosures (bates-stamped ADM00787-792) by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#52

(#52) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Ally Bank by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

44 #20

Exhibit 17

44 #19

Exhibit 16

44 #18

Exhibit 15

44 #17

Exhibit 14

44 #14

Exhibit 11

44 #13

Exhibit 10

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Best Friends Animal Society waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019.(Lamb, Shannon) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Ally Bank. (law) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Best Friends Animal Society, Stephen W. Webster filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Audio Recording of the October 15 2018 Windsor Probate Division Hearing by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Estate's Third Supplemental Disclosures (bates-stamped ADM00787-792) by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Ally Bank by Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #44 Reply to Response to #37 Amended Motion to Lift Stay filed by Stephen W. Webster. The Statement of Undisputed Material Facts has been replaced to correct the title of the pleading. The corrected document is now attached to #44 as well as this entry. (jlh) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Second Supplemental Disclosures (ADM00780-ADM00786) by Stephen W. Webster. (Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2019 re #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Change Venue, #14 MOTION to Change Venue, #34 MOTION to Lift Stay and #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay. Elizabeth Flowers, Esq. (via phone) & Shannon Lamb, Esq. present for pltf; Stephen Ellis, Esq. present for dft Webster; Clint Hansen, Esq. (via phone) & Scott McGee, Esq. present for dft Best Friend Animal Society. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: granting #21 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re: #14 MOTION to Change Venue, granting #34 MOTION to Lift Stay and granting #37 AMENDED MOTION to Lift Stay; stay is lifted for the purpose of limited discovery re: #14 Motion to Change Venue; plft to review documents and make sure everything has been turned over to dfts re: #14 Motion to Change Venue including phone calls and depositions; Supplemental/Post Hearing Memorandum due by 7/10/2019; if case is resolved at ENE, ptys are to notify the Court. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Carson, Capitol Court Reporting, Inc.) (jam) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER granting #46 Motion To Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Participate By Telephone; granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clint R. Hansen. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Clint Hansen filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(jlh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MOTION to Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Participate By Telephone filed by Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Micaela Tucker, Esq on behalf of Best Friends Animal Society. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by P. Scott McGee, III, Esq on behalf of Best Friends Animal Society.(McGee, III, P.) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATED AND JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Best Friends Animal Society.(McGee, III, P.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (jlh). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 Acceptance of Service and Waiver of Summons. The docket entry has been clarified to show Stephen W. Webster answer due 4/29/2019. (law) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE and Waiver of Summons: Stephen W. Webster served on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Lamb, Shannon) Text/dates clarified on 3/11/2019 (law). (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen D. Ellis, Esq on behalf of Stephen W. Webster.(Ellis, Stephen) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 Amended Complaint filed by Ally Bank. Exhibits 1 and 2 have been replaced on the docket as portions were illegible. The corrected documents are now attached to #4 as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (jlh) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER against Best Friends Animal Society, Stephen W. Webster filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(jam) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/1/2019) (jlh). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/1/2019) (jlh). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Best Friends Animal Society waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019.(Lamb, Shannon) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Ally Bank. (law) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Best Friends Animal Society, Stephen W. Webster filed by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant