This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:23:13 (UTC).

Allure Global Solutions, Inc. v. Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Allure Global Solutions, Inc against Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00594

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allure Global Solutions, Inc.

Defendant

Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.

 

Court Documents

11 #4

Exhibit

11 #5

Exhibit

5 #5

Proposed Order

11 #6

Proposed Order

11 #2

Exhibit

11 #3

Exhibit

11 #1

Exhibit

5 #4

Exhibit 4 - O'Keefe Declaration

5 #3

Exhibit 3 - Address Change

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - 08/23/19 KY SOS Filing

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - 08/23/19 GA SOS Filing

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Allure Global Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order) (Lasley, Edward) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08/23/19 GA SOS Filing, #2 Exhibit 2 - 08/23/19 KY SOS Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Address Change, #4 Exhibit 4 - O'Keefe Declaration) (McTighe, Chadwick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #5 Proposed Order) (JM). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#10

(#10) AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/3/2019. Schedules re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 10/8/2019. cc: Counsel (RLJ) Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct clerk error (RLJ). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #5 , #8 by Allure Global Solutions, Inc.. (Lasley, Edward) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/18/2019 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have until Thursday 10/3/2019 to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. cc: Counsel(RLJ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Allure Global Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lasley, Edward) Modified on 9/17/2019 to update motion description (RLJ). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Allure Global Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order) (Lasley, Edward) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/3/2019. Schedules re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 10/8/2019. cc: Counsel (RLJ) Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct clerk error (RLJ). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #5 , #8 by Allure Global Solutions, Inc.. (Lasley, Edward) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/18/2019 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have until Thursday 10/3/2019 to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. cc: Counsel(RLJ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Allure Global Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lasley, Edward) Modified on 9/17/2019 to update motion description (RLJ). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Order re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.. (McTighe, Chadwick) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08/23/19 GA SOS Filing, #2 Exhibit 2 - 08/23/19 KY SOS Filing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Address Change, #4 Exhibit 4 - O'Keefe Declaration) (McTighe, Chadwick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #5 Proposed Order) (JM). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-004704. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Elite Corporation for Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.. by Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.. (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-004704. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2928893) filed by Elite Manufacturing Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Purchase Order re menu boards, #3 Exhibit B - Purchase Order re digital screen, #4 Exhibit C - JCC Complaint, Mtn for Injunctive Relief, Memo, Order) (ALS) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.