This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 07:11:58 (UTC).

ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against BROAN-NUTONE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD J. PAPPERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04047

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD J. PAPPERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED

BROAN-NUTONE LLC

JAKEL INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATRICK A. HUGHES

Attorney at DELUCA LEVINE, LLC

Three Valley Square, 512 Township Line Rd Ste 220

Blue Bell, PA 19422

RAYMOND E. MACK

Attorney at de Luca Levine, LLC

Three Valley Square, Suite 220

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT J. HAFNER

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

1700 Market St Ste 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/13/20. 10/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#12

(#12) Stipulation to Approve Stipulated Protective Order with Proposed Form of Order by BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (HAFNER, ROBERT) Modified on 10/14/2020 (fb). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#11

(#11) STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/20/2020 AT 1:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/30/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND E. MACK on behalf of ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MACK, RAYMOND) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#8

(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nortek, Inc. by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Regal Beloit Corporation by JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Defenses by JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re: Denise Fabela served Summons and Complaint upon BROAN-NUTONE LLC by Personal. BROAN-NUTONE LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020 (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Motors Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020 (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14506335.), filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/13/20. 10/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulation to Approve Stipulated Protective Order with Proposed Form of Order by BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (HAFNER, ROBERT) Modified on 10/14/2020 (fb). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Rule 26(f) by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/20/2020 AT 1:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/30/20. 10/1/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND E. MACK on behalf of ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MACK, RAYMOND) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nortek, Inc. by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Regal Beloit Corporation by JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Defenses by JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re: Denise Fabela served Summons and Complaint upon BROAN-NUTONE LLC by Personal. BROAN-NUTONE LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020 (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kurt Wald re: served Complaint upon Jakel Motors Incorporated by Personal on 8/24/2020 (HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/20/20 (JL) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (fb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BROAN-NUTONE LLC, JAKEL INCORPORATED, JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14506335.), filed by ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(HUGHES, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less