This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 10:55:20 (UTC).

Allstate Insurance Company v. Kohler Co et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Allstate Insurance Company filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Kohler Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00590

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Insurance Company

Defendants

LSP Products Group Inc

Kohler Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Daniel Pruitt

Po Box 8594

Greenville, SC 29604

Defendant Attorneys

Brent Brigham Young

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell and Berkowitz

Po Box 3038

Johnson City, TN 37602

Ryan Charles Holt

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Charles Griffith Doolittle

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Insurance Company.(Pruitt, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/6/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/24/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/29/2021, Discovery due by 3/30/2022, Motions due by 4/20/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2022, Mediation Due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/22/21. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LSP Products Group Inc.(Young, Brent) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, March 22, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The Court will conduct the conference via telephone. Counsel shall initiate the call and once everyone is on the line please call Judge Anderson at 803-765-5136. Alternatively, the parties may supply a conference call-in number to chambers. Matters to be taken up during the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) if the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 3/1/21. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kohler Co.(mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kohler Co. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

1 #4

State Court Documents Notice of Appearance by Brent B. Young

1 #3

Consent to Removal by LSP Products Group

1 #2

State Court Documents Answer by LSP Products Group Inc

1 #1

State Court Documents Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kershaw County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-28-850. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9675826), filed by Kohler Co. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Answer by LSP Products Group Inc, #3 Consent to Removal by LSP Products Group, #4 State Court Documents Notice of Appearance by Brent B. Young)(mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Insurance Company.(Pruitt, Charles) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/6/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/24/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/29/2021, Discovery due by 3/30/2022, Motions due by 4/20/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2022, Mediation Due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/22/21. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 3/22/2021. Court to file scheduling order. Court Reporter not present. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. The #1 Notice of Removal was filed on 2/26/21. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than 3/26/21. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by LSP Products Group Inc.(Young, Brent) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, March 22, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The Court will conduct the conference via telephone. Counsel shall initiate the call and once everyone is on the line please call Judge Anderson at 803-765-5136. Alternatively, the parties may supply a conference call-in number to chambers. Matters to be taken up during the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) if the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 3/1/21. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than 3/15/21 re #1 Notice of Removal. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kohler Co.(mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kohler Co. (mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kershaw County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-28-850. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9675826), filed by Kohler Co. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Answer by LSP Products Group Inc, #3 Consent to Removal by LSP Products Group, #4 State Court Documents Notice of Appearance by Brent B. Young)(mflo, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LSP Products Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHLER CO. A WISCONSIN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant