This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2022 at 09:47:05 (UTC).

Allstate Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Allstate Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Omar A. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01031

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Omar A. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Insurance Company

Defendant

Electrolux Home Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek E. Donnelly

Attorney at Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn

2 Concorde Way # 3C, P.O. Box 608

Windsor Locks, CT 06096

Patrick A. Hughes

Attorney at de Luca Levine LLC

301 E. Germantown Pike, 3Rd Fl, 19401

East Norriton, PA 19422

Raymond E. Mack

Attorney at de Luca Levine LLC

301 E. Germantown Pike, 3Rd Fl, 19401

East Norriton, PA 19422

Defendant Attorneys

Adam J. LaFleche

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

100 Pearl Street, Ste 1100

Hartford, CT 06103

Jeffrey Jerome Cunningham

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

50 Main Street, Suite 425

White Plains, NY 10606

Robert J. Chomiak, Jr.

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP - CT

100 Pearl Street, Suite 1100

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#27

(#27) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/5/2022.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Chomiak, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#24

(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jerome Cunningham on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Cunningham, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#22

(#22) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Chomiak, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Hughes on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE. All parties are advised that they may elect to consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. United States Magistrate Judges do not conduct felony criminal trials; as a result, parties are often able to schedule a jury trial before a Magistrate Judge sooner and with more flexibility than a jury trial before a District Judge. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge, the parties should complete and file the attached consent form. If any party does not consent, that information should not be conveyed to the Court, and no consent form should be filed. The Court notes that ordinarily, where the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, any Magistrate Judge who has previously been involved in confidential settlement discussions would not be assigned to hear the trial. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/20/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#19

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. LaFleche on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (LaFleche, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Electrolux Home Products, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SCHEDULING ORDER. The court thanks the parties for submitting their Rule 26(f) Planning Report, see ECF No. #28 , and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all procedures and deadlines proposed therein, as amended herein. In addition, the parties' request for referral to a United States Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference is granted. The Clerk respectfully is requested to refer the case for that purpose. The court adopts the following deadlines:Discovery due by June 15, 2023.Dispositive Motions due by July 14, 2023.Joint Trial Memorandum due by July 14, 2023, or if dispositive motions are filed, the date specified in the courts ruling on such motions.The parties shall be ready for trial by August 28, 2023, or within forty-five days after the parties file their Joint Trial Memorandum, whichever is later. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/13/22. (Codeanne, K.) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/5/2022.(Perez, J.) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#26) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Omar A. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2022.(Hushin, Z.) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Chomiak, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jerome Cunningham on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Cunningham, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Chomiak, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Hughes on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Hughes, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE. All parties are advised that they may elect to consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. United States Magistrate Judges do not conduct felony criminal trials; as a result, parties are often able to schedule a jury trial before a Magistrate Judge sooner and with more flexibility than a jury trial before a District Judge. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge, the parties should complete and file the attached consent form. If any party does not consent, that information should not be conveyed to the Court, and no consent form should be filed. The Court notes that ordinarily, where the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, any Magistrate Judge who has previously been involved in confidential settlement discussions would not be assigned to hear the trial. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/20/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. LaFleche on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (LaFleche, Adam) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Electrolux Home Products, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. All counsel and self-represented parties are advised that any requests for relief, including the rescheduling of conferences or hearings that have been calendared on ECF, must be made by filing of a motion on the docket, in full compliance with all applicable Federal and Local Rules. Relief from deadlines, orders, and calendars may not be obtained by calling or emailing chambers staff or the Clerk's Office. Court staff cannot provide advice or guidance, and ex parte communications with the Court are generally improper. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2022; Discovery due by 2/14/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2023 Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJudge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Donnelly, Derek) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7033666.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donnelly, Derek) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant