This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2020 at 09:28:14 (UTC).

Allstate Insurance Company v. Dela-Cruz et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Allstate Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Dela-Cruz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Alice Theiler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05353

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Alice Theiler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Insurance Company

Defendants

United States Postal Service

Glenn Dela-Cruz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christine Lynn Reinert

Attorney at MACMILLAN SCHOLZ & MARKS

900 Sw 5Th Avenue, Suite 1800

Portland, OR 97206

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#4

(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Glenn Dela-Cruz on 5/6/2020 (Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#3

(#3) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States Postal Service on 5/5/2020 (Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Glenn Dela-Cruz and United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6270800) Attorney Christine Lynn Reinert added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. This case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party pursuant to plaintiff's #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (KMP) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Glenn Dela-Cruz on 5/6/2020 (Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States Postal Service on 5/5/2020 (Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/29/2020. (MET) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketThis case should have been opened as a Seattle case and has now been assigned from a Seattle case assignment deck. The case number will remain the same. (SP) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Glenn Dela-Cruz and United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketHon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SP) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6270800) Attorney Christine Lynn Reinert added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Reinert, Christine) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less