Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 19:11:55 (UTC).

Allstate Insurance Company et al v. New Century Pharmacy Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Allstate Insurance Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against New Century Pharmacy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05702

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allstate Indemnity Company

Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants

My Rx Pharmacy, Inc.

Rafo Yaguda

Life Health Care Medical, P.C.

Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D.

Eduard Aronov

First Class Medical, P.C.

Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D.

GONY Medical Services P.C.

Alexander Sharafyan

Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc

Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.

NY Medical Arts, P.C.

Katrin Matatov

Boris Kandov

Richmond Medical Care P.C.

Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc

Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan A. Tilden

Attorney at Smith & Brink P.C.

1325 Franklin Ave., Suite 320

Garden City, NY 11530

Shauna L. Sullivan

Attorney at Smith & Brink, P.C.

350 Granite Street, Suite 350

Braintree, MA 02184

Michael W Whitcher

Attorney at Smith & Brink, P.C.

350 Granite Street, Suite 2303

Braintree, MA 02184

Richard D. King, Jr.

Attorney at Smith & Brink, P.C.

1325 Franklin Avenue, Suite 320

Garden City, NY 11530

Jasmine Garcia-Vieux

Attorney at Smith & Brink, P.C.

1325 Franklin Avenue, Suite 320

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Maria Campese

Attorney at Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC

666 Old Country Road, Suite 900

Garden City, NY 11530

Matthew J. Conroy

Attorney at Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC

666 Old Country Road, Suite 900

Garden City, NY 11530

Nicholas Paul Bowers

Attorney at Gary Tsirelman, P.C.

129 Livingston Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Lance Lazzaro

Attorney at Lazzaro Law Firm, P.C.

360 Court St., Suite 3

Brooklyn, NY 11231

Charles H. Horn

Attorney at The Russell Friedman Law Group, LLP

3000 Marcus Avenue, Suite 2E03

Lake Success, NY 11042

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, New Century Pharmacy Inc.. (Lazzaro, Lance) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#46

(#46) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C.. (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

#45

(#45) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.. (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

44 #1

Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer

#44

(#44) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Rafo Yaguda. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer) (Bowers, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Rafo Yaguda (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

41 #1

Stipulation

#41

(#41) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#38

ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, and New Century Pharmacy Inc. ("Defendants"). Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2019. (Shanies, Rachel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #29

Exhibit 27

1 #28

Exhibit 26

1 #25

Exhibit 23

1 #23

Exhibit 21

1 #22

Exhibit 20

1 #21

Exhibit 19

1 #20

Exhibit 18

1 #9

Exhibit 7

1 #8

Exhibit 6

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, New Century Pharmacy Inc.. (Lazzaro, Lance) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C.. (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.. (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc., Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, and Rafo Yaguda. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/18/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Rafo Yaguda. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer) (Bowers, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Eduard Aronov, Katrin Matatov, and New Century Pharmacy Inc. ("Defendants"). Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2019. (Shanies, Rachel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to GONY Medical Services P.C, Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., NY Medical Arts, P.C. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 11/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Rafo Yaguda (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., NY Medical Arts, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by GONY Medical Services P.C., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Horn, Charles) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Garcia-Vieux on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Garcia-Vieux, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna L. Sullivan on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sullivan, Shauna) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Whitcher on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Whitcher, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tilden, Nathan) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (King, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Eduard Aronov, Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D., Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D., Direct Rx Pharmacy Inc, Amr A. El-Sanduby, M.D., First Class Medical, P.C., GONY Medical Services P.C., Boris Kandov, Life Health Care Medical, P.C., Katrin Matatov, My Rx Pharmacy, Inc., NY Medical Arts, P.C., New Century Pharmacy Inc., Tomas M. Pattugalan, Jr., M.D., Refill Rx Pharmacy Inc, Richmond Medical Care P.C., Alexander Sharafyan, Mani Ushyarov, D.O., Rafo Yaguda filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11927600 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28) (King, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard D. King, Jr.