Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2019 at 07:43:22 (UTC).

Allstate Indemnity Company v. Wicke et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Allstate Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wicke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith E. Levy and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-10292

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Indemnity Company

Defendants

Richard Rondeau

Kenneth Wicke

Stephanie Wicke

Leah Rondeau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cary R. Berlin

Attorney at Patrick, Johnson & Mott, P.C.

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 1400

Southfield, MI 48034-8216

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Stempien

Attorney at Stempien Law PLLC

29829 Greenfield Road, Suite 102

Southfield, MI 48076

Edward J. Wloszek, III

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis, & Acho, P.L.C.

17436 College Parkway, Third Floor

Livonia, MI 48152

Matthew W. Heron

Attorney at Hirzel Law, PLC

37085 Grand River Avenue, Suite 200

Farmington, MI 48168

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Order Vacating #10 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Kenneth Wicke, Stephanie Wicke. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Wloszek, Edward) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Leah Rondeau, Richard Rondeau. (Stempien, Eric) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward J. Wloszek, III appearing on behalf of Kenneth Wicke, Stephanie Wicke (Wloszek, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Heron on behalf of Kenneth Wicke, Stephanie Wicke. (Heron, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Stempien on behalf of Leah Rondeau, Richard Rondeau. (Stempien, Eric) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A- E-MAILS RE EXTENSIONS

#11

(#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- E-MAILS RE EXTENSIONS) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2019. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenneth Wicke served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Richard Rondeau served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Leah Rondeau served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stephanie Wicke served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued for *Stephanie Wicke* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Kenneth Wicke* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Richard Rondeau* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Order Vacating #10 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Kenneth Wicke, Stephanie Wicke. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Wloszek, Edward) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Leah Rondeau, Richard Rondeau. (Stempien, Eric) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward J. Wloszek, III appearing on behalf of Kenneth Wicke, Stephanie Wicke (Wloszek, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Heron on behalf of Kenneth Wicke, Stephanie Wicke. (Heron, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Stempien on behalf of Leah Rondeau, Richard Rondeau. (Stempien, Eric) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- E-MAILS RE EXTENSIONS) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2019. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenneth Wicke served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Richard Rondeau served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Leah Rondeau served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stephanie Wicke served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued for *Stephanie Wicke* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Kenneth Wicke* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Richard Rondeau* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Leah Rondeau* (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Allstate Indemnity Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7085356 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 18-010850-NO, Judge Patricia Perez Fresard] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Berlin, Cary) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cary R. Berlin