This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2023 at 07:35:19 (UTC).

Allisyn Shlank v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 03/28/2023 Allisyn Shlank filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pedro V. Castillo and Consuelo B. Marshall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02291

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

Presiding Judge

Consuelo B. Marshall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allisyn Shlank

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Susan B Grabarsky

Phillip S Bather

Frank N Darras

Defendant Attorney

Jason A James

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35039087 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party Allisyn Shlank(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#2

(#2) Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules.(See order for details) (ys) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

10 #1

Unredacted Document

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 5/31/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 5/31/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules.(See order for details) (ys) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35039087 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Allisyn Shlank. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party Allisyn Shlank(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less