This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 10:04:29 (UTC).

Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Security Protection Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Security Protection Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01792

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Defendants

IRG DOWNEY, LLC

SECURITY PROTECTION SERVICES, INC.

ALBERTA DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC

LYLE PARKS, JR. CONSTRUCTION, INC.

PCCP IRG DOWNEY, LLC

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS, INC.

Alberta Tierra Luna Management, LLC

DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Z Keller

Jamie A Radack

Stephen M Hayes

Benjamin L Chen

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit to Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jamie A Radack on behalf of Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Attorney Jamie A Radack added to party Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Radack, Jamie) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Alberta Development Partners, LLC, Alberta Tierra Luna Management, LLC, Command Performance Constructors, Inc., IRG Downey, LLC, Lyle Parks, Jr. Construction, Inc., PCCP IRG Downey, LLC, Security Protection Services, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, identifying ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY HOLDINGS, LTD (BERMUDA) and FAIRFAX FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LIMITED (CANADA). (Keller, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Keller, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Keller, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28156489 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint) (Attorney Ryan Z Keller added to party Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Keller, Ryan) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less