This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:47:12 (UTC).

Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Quik Travel Staffing, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Quik Travel Staffing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00972

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Defendants

Quik Travel Staffing, Inc.

Alana Marie Ortiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chanda Marie Feldkamp

William James Kelly, III

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Dawson Varholak

Jerome H. Sturhahn

Daniel Alejandro Pedraza

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #8

Summons to Quik Travel Staffing, Inc.

1 #7

Summons to Alana Marie Ortiz

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Alana Marie Ortiz served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Kelly, William) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pedraza, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Related Case by Defendant Quik Travel Staffing, Inc. (Sturhahn, Jerome) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Chanda Marie Feldkamp (Feldkamp, Chanda) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William James Kelly, III on behalf of Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance CompanyAttorney William James Kelly, III added to party Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Kelly, William) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/15/2020.The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #[3-2]) is due 7/15/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/4/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine Dawson Varholak on behalf of Quik Travel Staffing, Inc.Attorney Katherine Dawson Varholak added to party Quik Travel Staffing, Inc.(pty:dft) (Varholak, Katherine) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allied World Specialty Insurance Company for Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Feldkamp, Chanda) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Quik Travel Staffing, Inc. waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Feldkamp, Chanda) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alana Marie Ortiz, Quik Travel Staffing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7240298)Attorney Chanda Marie Feldkamp added to party Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Summons to Alana Marie Ortiz, #8 Summons to Quik Travel Staffing, Inc.)(Feldkamp, Chanda) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less