This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2019 at 07:34:26 (UTC).

Allied World National Assurance Company v. The Howard Hughes Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Allied World National Assurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Howard Hughes Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00667

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allied World National Assurance Company

Defendants

The Howard Hughes Corporation

The Woodlands Land Development Company, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Clark

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77056

Kristen Welsh McDanald

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 3/18/2019 (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal as to The Howard Hughes Corporation, The Woodlands Land Development Company, L.P. by Allied World National Assurance Company, filed. (Clark, David) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World National Assurance Company identifying Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc. and Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(McDanald, Kristen) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Clark, David) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21943691) filed by Allied World National Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Clark, David) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 3/18/2019 (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Dismissal as to The Howard Hughes Corporation, The Woodlands Land Development Company, L.P. by Allied World National Assurance Company, filed. (Clark, David) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied World National Assurance Company identifying Allied World Assurance Holdings (U.S.) Inc. and Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG as Corporate Parent, filed.(McDanald, Kristen) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Clark, David) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21943691) filed by Allied World National Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Clark, David) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Howard Hughes Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied World National Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Clark