This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 09:00:24 (UTC).

Allied World Assurance Company et al v. World Fuel Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Allied World Assurance Company filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against World Fuel Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03234

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Appellant

Allied World Assurance Company

Debtor

Evergreen Helicopters International, Inc.

Appellees

World Fuel Services, Inc.

World Fuel Services Inc

Not Classified By Court

Harlin D Hale

Dallas, TX 75242

Case Admin Sup

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Kendall Kelly Hayden

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main Street, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Eric D Freed

Attorney at Cozen Oconnor PC

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eric L Scherling

Attorney at Cozen Oconnor PC

1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Appellee Attorney

Patricia B Tomasco

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Dismissal Agreed Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Appeals Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 re: #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference, filed by Allied World Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayden, Kendall) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

1 #1

Notice of appeal and supporting documents

#1

(#1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 16-34392 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:20-cv-3234. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documents) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #2 NOTICE of Dismissal. (mjr) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Dismissal Agreed Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Appeals Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 re: #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference, filed by Allied World Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayden, Kendall) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNew Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (mjr) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 16-34392 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:20-cv-3234. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documents) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where World Fuel Services Singapore Pte Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia Baron Tomasco Esq.