This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2021 at 08:27:47 (UTC).

Allied Trust Insurance Company v. Bootes

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Allied Trust Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bootes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01384

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allied Trust Insurance Company

Defendant

Jennifer Bootes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Daniel Patton

Attorney at Bain and Barkley

14090 Southwest Fwy, Ste 450

Sugar Land, TX 77478

James Floyd McMartin, IV

Attorney at Patel PC

7324 Southwest Fwy., Ste. 560

Houston, TX 77074

Defendant Attorney

Joshua Paul Davis

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1010 Lamar, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

#13

12 #3

Proposed Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Selected Excerpts from Defendant's Examination Under O

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified Policy

#12

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

9 #5

Proposed Order

9 #4

Exhibit D

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

1 #1

Exhibit Policy

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Oral Hearing by Allied Trust Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McMartin, James) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #10 Complaint by Allied Trust Insurance Company, filed.(McMartin, James) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint , filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Selected Excerpts from Defendant's Examination Under Oath, #3 Proposed Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(McMartin, James) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certificate of Interested Parties by Jennifer Bootes, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) COMPLAINT against Allied Trust Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26560490) filed by Jennifer Bootes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Jennifer Bootes, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re: DEFENDANTS WAIVER OF SUMMONS, DEFENDANTS ANSWER DUE DATE AND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Jennifer Bootes, filed.(Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allied Trust Insurance Company, filed.(McMartin, James) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by James F. McMartin, IV on behalf of Allied Trust Insurance Company, filed. (McMartin, James) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jennifer Bootes filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Policy)(Patton, Justin) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jennifer Bootes. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jennifer Bootes, filed.(Patton, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jennifer Bootes (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26351039) filed by Allied Trust Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Patton, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua P. Davis