This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:25:34 (UTC).

Allianz Nederland Corporate v. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Allianz Nederland Corporate filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against C H Robinson International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04118

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allianz Nederland Corporate

Defendants

C.H. Robinson International, Inc.

Americold Logistics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lawrence Caruso Glynn

Attorney at Caruso Glynn, LLC

53-04 193Rd Street

Fresh Meadow, NY 11365

Defendant Attorneys

George W. Wright

Attorney at George W. Wright & Associates, LLC

88 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Narinder S. Parmar

Attorney at George W. Wright & Associates, LLC

88 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Felice Jill Cotignola

Attorney at Lester, Schwab, Katz and Dwyer LLP

100 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Thomas Anthony Catalano

Attorney at Lester, Schwab, Katz and Dwyer LLP

100 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#1

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AmeriCold Logistics LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent et al Allianz for Allianz Nederland Corporate. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AmeriCold Logistics LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#7

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Narinder S. Parmar on behalf of C.H. Robinson International, Inc...(Parmar, Narinder) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Anthony Catalano on behalf of Americold Logistics LLC..(Catalano, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#13

(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Americold Realty Trust, Inc. for Americold Logistics LLC. Document filed by Americold Logistics LLC..(Catalano, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felice Jill Cotignola on behalf of Americold Logistics LLC..(Cotignola, Felice) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Americold Logistics LLC. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. waiver sent on 5/25/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: (Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference is reset for 7/20/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.)The dial in information remains the same as previously posted.. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415.) (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. waiver sent on 5/25/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Jed S. Rakoff for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Americold Logistics LLC. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felice Jill Cotignola on behalf of Americold Logistics LLC..(Cotignola, Felice) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Americold Realty Trust, Inc. for Americold Logistics LLC. Document filed by Americold Logistics LLC..(Catalano, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Anthony Catalano on behalf of Americold Logistics LLC..(Catalano, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Narinder S. Parmar on behalf of C.H. Robinson International, Inc...(Parmar, Narinder) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AmeriCold Logistics LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent et al Allianz for Allianz Nederland Corporate. Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Caruso Glynn. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Americold Logistics LLC, C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26172904)Document filed by Allianz Nederland Corporate..(Glynn, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICOLD LOGISTICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CH Robinson Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Felice Jill Cotignola

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Anthony Catalano