This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 08:41:40 (UTC).

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00576

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Defendant

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Matthew Little

Attorney at Teague, Campbell, Dennis & Gorham

4800 Six Forks Road, Suite, 300

Raleigh, NC 27609

Megan N. Silver

Attorney at Teague Campbell Dennis & Gorham, LLP

P.O. Box 19207

Raleigh, NC 27619

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Elizabeth O'Neill

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 S. College Street, Ste,. 3500, 301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Reid Calwell Adams, Jr.

Attorney at Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, PLLC

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Adams, Reid) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (O'Neill, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER denying Defendant's #12 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #3 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/3/2021. (mek) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Adams, Reid) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint, . Travelers Property Casualty Company of America answer due 12/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/9/2021. (brl) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Calwell Adams, Jr on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Adams, Reid) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company NC Department of Insurance as process agent for Travelers Property Casualty of America (Little, J.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Silver, Megan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan N. Silver on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Silver, Megan) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (dgr) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

3 #3

Exhibit Ex C Pendergrass Complaint

3 #2

Exhibit Ex B Allianz Policy

3 #1

Exhibit Ex A Travelers Policy

3 #3

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/11/2022. (clc) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Adams, Reid) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (O'Neill, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER denying Defendant's #12 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #3 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/3/2021. (mek) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint, by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adams, Reid). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/3/2021) (mek). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Adams, Reid) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint, . Travelers Property Casualty Company of America answer due 12/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/9/2021. (brl) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #3 Complaint, by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adams, Reid). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Calwell Adams, Jr on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Adams, Reid) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company NC Department of Insurance as process agent for Travelers Property Casualty of America (Little, J.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Silver, Megan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan N. Silver on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Silver, Megan) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (dgr) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (dgr) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(dgr) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America with Jury Demand, filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $402.00, receipt number ANCWDC 5288189) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Travelers Policy, #2 Exhibit Ex B Allianz Policy, #3 Exhibit Ex C Pendergrass Complaint)(Little, J.) Modified on 10/27/2021 to add receipt number (dgr). (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Little, J.) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Matthew Little on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company (Little, J.) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REID CALWELL ADAMS, JR.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Elizabeth O'Neill