This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2022 at 08:10:28 (UTC).

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company v. Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar and Jerry H. Ritter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Defendant

Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Muirhead

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.

P. O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Jennifer G. Anderson

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Po Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth M. Piazza

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880, 87199

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Terry R. Guebert

Attorney at Guebert Gentile & Piazza P.C.

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199-3880

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC Notice of Agreed Extension of Time (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC Notice of Agreed Extension of Time (Piazza, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC. (jg) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee received online: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-8139887 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Unjust Enrichment against Hot Air Balloonatics, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth M. Piazza

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry R. Guebert