This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 08:04:13 (UTC).

Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. v. Grand Lux Cafe LLC

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Allianz Global Corporate Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss Co filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Grand Lux Cafe LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey Cole and Robert W. Gettleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06789

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffrey Cole

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Gettleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co.

Defendant

Grand Lux Cafe LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Francis Policastro

123 North Wacker Drive, Ste 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Ann Georginis

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

10 South Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Kathleen Magill Sullivan Klein

Attorney at Clausen Miller Pc

10 S. Lasalle St.

Chicago, IL 60603

William P. Pistorius

Attorney at Clausen Miller P.C.

10 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Judge Gettleman has referred the case here for discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement proceedings. #12 . Parties are to submit a Joint Status Report including a recommended Joint Discovery Schedule by 12/21/20. Telephone Status Conference is set for 3/2/21 at 10:00am to discuss the progress of discovery. Counsel should call (888) 684-8852, access code 5618926.#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Counsel should contact the Court should any difficulties arise during depositions. I can be reached by a call to my courtroom deputy, Yulonda Thomas, at 312-408-5178, and she will arrange for me to participate in the phone call. Mailed notice (yt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Lux Cafe LLC by Stacy Ann Georginis (Georginis, Stacy) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#12

(#12) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement proceedings. (cn) Mailed notice. (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement proceedings to Magistrate Judge Cole. Telephonic status hearing set before this court on 12/16/2021 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1503395. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#10

(#10) STATUS Report (Rule 26(f) Joint Status Report) by Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#9

(#9) 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Grand Lux Cafe LLC (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#8

(#8) 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. by Matthew Francis Policastro (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

6 #1

Joint Status Report

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form by 12/10/2020. Defendant is directed to send a copy of this order to plaintiff's counsel. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (cn). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Grand Lux Cafe LLC(Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Lux Cafe LLC by Kathleen Magill Sullivan Klein (Klein, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Lux Cafe LLC by William P. Pistorius (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020L010911) filed by Grand Lux Cafe LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17651026. (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Judge Gettleman has referred the case here for discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement proceedings. #12 . Parties are to submit a Joint Status Report including a recommended Joint Discovery Schedule by 12/21/20. Telephone Status Conference is set for 3/2/21 at 10:00am to discuss the progress of discovery. Counsel should call (888) 684-8852, access code 5618926.#. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Counsel should contact the Court should any difficulties arise during depositions. I can be reached by a call to my courtroom deputy, Yulonda Thomas, at 312-408-5178, and she will arrange for me to participate in the phone call. Mailed notice (yt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Lux Cafe LLC by Stacy Ann Georginis (Georginis, Stacy) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement proceedings. (cn) Mailed notice. (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement proceedings to Magistrate Judge Cole. Telephonic status hearing set before this court on 12/16/2021 at 9:15 a.m. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1503395. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATUS Report (Rule 26(f) Joint Status Report) by Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Grand Lux Cafe LLC (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, a/s/o Levi Strauss & Co. by Matthew Francis Policastro (Policastro, Matthew) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form by 12/10/2020. Defendant is directed to send a copy of this order to plaintiff's counsel. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (cn). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Grand Lux Cafe LLC(Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Lux Cafe LLC by Kathleen Magill Sullivan Klein (Klein, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Grand Lux Cafe LLC by William P. Pistorius (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020L010911) filed by Grand Lux Cafe LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17651026. (Pistorius, William) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Levi Strauss & Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Grand Lux Cafe LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew F. Policastro