This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2019 at 07:56:49 (UTC).

ALLEY THEATRE v. HANOVER INSURANCE CO.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 ALLEY THEATRE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HANOVER INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01987

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEY THEATRE

Defendant

HANOVER INSURANCE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neal S Manne

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Chanler Ashton Langham

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

William RH Merrill

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1000 Louisiana, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Defendant Attorney

Peri Hayriye Alkas

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

500 Dallas Street, Ste 1300

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Supplement

#2

1 #9

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A (part 2 of 2)

1 #3

Exhibit A (part 1 of 2)

1 #2

Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ALLEY THEATRE, filed.(Merrill, William) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HANOVER INSURANCE CO., filed.(Alkas, Peri) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ALLEY THEATRE filed by ALLEY THEATRE.(Langham, Chanler) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 141st Judicial District Court, case number 2019-31244 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22538802) filed by HANOVER INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Exhibit A (part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit A (part 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Alkas, Peri) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY THE(ERRONEOUSLY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peri H. Alkas