This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 07:49:13 (UTC).

Allen v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Allen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02990

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISAIAH ALLEN

Defendant

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Corey Logan Seldin

Attorney at Remer and Georges-Pierre PLLC

44 W Flagler St.Suite #2200

Miami, FL 33130

Cristobal Bobadilla-Gamboa

Suite 2200151 Southeast 1St Street

Miami, FL 32832

Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre

44 West Flagler Streetsuite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorneys

Merry E. Lindberg

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

Suite 3251450 Centrepark Blvd

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Amy R. Turci

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

225 Water St Ste 710

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5145

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial Circuit- Polk County, case number 2021-CA-002595 filed in State Court on September 14, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19064672 filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Case Information, #3 Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Turci, Amy) Modified text on 12/28/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet (Turci, Amy) Modified text on 12/28/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Merry E. Lindberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Lead Counsel: Amy R. Turci. (Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 12/30/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 1/3/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(Turci, Amy) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 2/3/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lindberg, Merry) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Corey Logan Seldin on behalf of Isaiah Allen. Lead Counsel: Peter M. Hoogerwoerd, Esq. (Seldin, Corey) Modified text on 2/16/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 3.03 by Isaiah Allen. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 3.03 by Isaiah Allen. (Seldin, Corey) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Corey Logan Seldin on behalf of Isaiah Allen. Lead Counsel: Peter M. Hoogerwoerd, Esq. (Seldin, Corey) Modified text on 2/16/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lindberg, Merry) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Case Management Report" (Doc. #13) is granted. The parties may file the joint case management report on or before February 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 2/3/2022. (ANL) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE to counsel Cristobal Bobadilla-Gamboa of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 2/3/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(Turci, Amy) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint" (Doc. #7) is granted. Defendant may file its response on or before January 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 12/30/2021. (ANL) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 1/3/2022 (ABC). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Merry E. Lindberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Lead Counsel: Amy R. Turci. (Lindberg, Merry) Modified text on 12/30/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to counsel for Plaintiff as well as Defendant of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABC) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2990-TPB-TGW. (MLJ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet (Turci, Amy) Modified text on 12/28/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial Circuit- Polk County, case number 2021-CA-002595 filed in State Court on September 14, 2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19064672 filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Case Information, #3 Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Turci, Amy) Modified text on 12/28/2021 (ABC). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy R. Turci(Designation Retained)