This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 08:17:56 (UTC).

Allen v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sunbeam Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks and Kelly F. Pate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00561

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Emily C. Marks

Kelly F. Pate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy Allen

Defendants

Sunbeam Products, Inc.

Sky Eagle Holdings Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Daniel Talmadge, Jr.

Attorney at Morris, Cary, Andrews, Talmadge & Driggers, LLC

3334 Ross Clark Cl

Dothan, AL 36303

Defendant Attorney

William Leroy Waudby

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

1500 Urban Center Drive; Suite 450

Vestavia Hills, AL 35242

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER directing that on or before 11/29/2021, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 10/12/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Waudby, William) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral judge. Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (es, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion No Longer Referred: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (No PDF attached to this entry) (es, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing that def Sunbeam Products, Inc. must file a response by 10/4/2021 and should cause why the #7 motion to remand should not be granted; plf may file a reply by 10/12/2021, as further set out in order; counsel for the parties are directed to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the clerk by 10/12/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 9/20/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tracy Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Talmadge, Joseph) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tracy Allen. (Talmadge, Joseph) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Tracy Allen. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Sunbeam Products, Inc..(wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Filing to State Court by Sunbeam Products, Inc. re: filing of #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -7 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tracy Allen. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (First Amended State Court Complaint) against Sky Eagle Holdings Corp., Sunbeam Products, Inc., filed by Tracy Allen. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 -1 for pdf)(wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sunbeam Products, Inc. from Circuit Court of Pike County, Alabama, case number 55-cv-2020-000080.00. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064502) (Attachments: #1 State Court Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing to State Court, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Receipt)(wcl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbeam Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William L Waudby