This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 10:23:07 (UTC).

Allen v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Allen filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01249

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phyllis Joan Allen

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen A. Hampton

Attorney at Grady & Hampton

6 North Bradford Street

Dover, DE 19904

David F. Chermol

Defendant Attorney

Heather Benderson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

P.O. Box 41777

Philadelphia, PA 19101

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Benderson on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Benderson, Heather) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David F. Chermol for Phyllis Joan Allen added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Chermol filed by Phyllis Joan Allen. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/30/20. (ntl) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David F. Chermol - filed by Phyllis Joan Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Hampton, Stephen) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Andrew M. Saul - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3207086.) - filed by Phyllis Joan Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less