This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2020 at 09:29:01 (UTC).

Allen v. Minact Inc

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Allen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Minact Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and S Maurice Hicks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01296

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theudas Allen

Petitioner

Mr. Theudas Allen

Defendants

minact

Minact Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Ernest Harold Gilliam, III

Attorney at Law Office of Ernest Gilliam

400 Travis St Ste 312

Shreveport, LA 71101

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INSUFFICIENT - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Theudas Allen. Minact Inc . (aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 11/2/2020 to remove answer due date and indicate insufficient (Jones, P). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Minact Inc. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Complaint with Cover Sheet filed by Theudas Allen regarding #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 10/15/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency to Ernest Harold Gilliam, III on behalf of Theudas Allen regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: No Civil Cover Sheet. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Minact Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4410688) filed by Theudas Allen.(Attorney Ernest Harold Gilliam, III added to party Theudas Allen(pty:pet))(aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 10/5/2020 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 10/15/2020 to remove deficiency, edit text and indicate SEE #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Jones, P). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INSUFFICIENT - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Theudas Allen. Minact Inc . (aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 11/2/2020 to remove answer due date and indicate insufficient (Jones, P). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/16/2020. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Minact Inc. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Complaint with Cover Sheet filed by Theudas Allen regarding #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 10/15/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency to Ernest Harold Gilliam, III on behalf of Theudas Allen regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: No Civil Cover Sheet. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Minact Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4410688) filed by Theudas Allen.(Attorney Ernest Harold Gilliam, III added to party Theudas Allen(pty:pet))(aty,Gilliam, Ernest) Modified on 10/5/2020 to indicate deficiency (Jones, P). Modified on 10/15/2020 to remove deficiency, edit text and indicate SEE #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Jones, P). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MINACT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest Harold Gilliam, III