This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 10:39:46 (UTC).

Allen v. McNeill Hotel Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Allen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against McNeill Hotel Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02849

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aja Allen

Defendants

McNeill Hotel Company, LLC

MHI GERMANTOWN HI ) OpCo, LLC

MHI GERMANTOWN HI OpCo, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven George Wilson

Attorney at THE STEVE WILSON FIRM

5100 Poplar Avenue, Suite 2700

Memphis, TN 38137

Matthew Charles Gulotta

Attorney at THE GULOTTA FIRM, PLLC

202 Adams Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Fredrick J. Bissinger

Attorney at WIMBERLY LAWSON WRIGHT DAVES & JONES, PLLC

214 2Nd Avenue North, Suite 3

Nashville, TN 37201

Brent Morris

Attorney at WIMBERLY LAWSON WRIGHT DAVES & JONES

Tennessee, 214 Second Avenue North, Suite 3, Nashville

Nashville, TN 37201

Jerome D Pinn

Attorney at WIMBERLY LAWSON WRIGHT DAVES & JONES, PLLC

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 1/5/2021. (Entered: 1/5/2021) (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint MHI GERMANTOWN HI OpCo, LLC answer due 1/22/2020; McNeill Hotel Company, LLC answer due 1/22/2020.. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 2/18/2020. (jae) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome D Pinn on behalf of All Defendants (Pinn, Jerome) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Morris on behalf of All Defendants (Morris, Brent) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick J. Bissinger on behalf of All Defendants (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to McNeill Hotel Company, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to MHI GERMANTOWN HI ) OpCo, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Summons by Steven George Wilson on behalf of Aja Allen. (Wilson, Steven) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Summons by Steven George Wilson on behalf of Aja Allen. (Wilson, Steven) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Charles Gulotta on behalf of Aja Allen (Gulotta, Matthew) (Entered: 11/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3489244), filed by Aja Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Steven) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerome D Pinn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fredrick J. Bissinger